EP0278152 - Telescoping tube omni-directional shear wave vibrator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CONOCO INC. 1000 South Pine Street Ponca City Oklahoma 74603 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/33] | For all designated states CONOCO INC. 1000 South Pine Street Ponca City Oklahoma 74603 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cole, Jack H. 3613 Nottingham Circle Ponca City OK 74604 / US | [1988/33] | Representative(s) | Davies, Christopher Robert, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/33] | Davies, Christopher Robert, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 87306947.0 | 05.08.1987 | [1988/33] | Priority number, date | US19870009989 | 02.02.1987 Original published format: US 9989 | [1988/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0278152 | Date: | 17.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0278152 | Date: | 07.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0278152 | Date: | 04.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G01V1/053, G01V1/09 | [1988/33] | CPC: |
G01V1/053 (EP,US);
G01V1/09 (EP,US);
Y10S181/401 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/33] | Title | German: | Omnidirektionaler Transversalwellenerreger mit einem Teleskoprohr | [1988/33] | English: | Telescoping tube omni-directional shear wave vibrator | [1988/33] | French: | Générateur d'ondes transversales omnidirectionnel muni d'un tube télescopique | [1988/33] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 31.08.1989 | Examination requested [1989/44] | 31.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.08.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 04.03.1992 | GB | 05.08.1992 | [2015/21] |
Former [1993/47] | FR | 24.07.1992 | |
GB | 05.08.1992 | ||
Former [1993/10] | FR | 24.07.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3860087 (SILVERMAN DANIEL); | [A]FR2459982 (GEOPHYSIQUE CIE GLE); | [A]US4310066 (WON IHN J); | [A]DE1121861 (ADOLF WEILER DR ING); | [AD]US3365019 (BAYS MARVIN G) |