Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] |
18.03.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.05.1992 [1992/19] |
20.09.1990 | First examination report | |
25.05.1989 | Request for examination filed | published on 12.07.1989 [1989/28] |
31.12.1988 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 15.02.1989 [1989/07] |