EP0257950 - method of inducing birds to molt [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.10.1990 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EMBREX INC. P.O. Box 13989 Research Triangle Park North Carolina 27709-3989 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/09] | For all designated states EMBREX INC. P.O. Box 13989 Research Triangle Park North Carolina 27709-3989 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Edens, Frank Wesley 326 Northclift Drive Raleigh North Carolina 27609 / US | 02 /
Thaxton, James Paul Route 7 Box 82 Apex North Carolina 27502 / US | [1988/09] | Representative(s) | Bankes, Stephen Charles Digby, et al Baron Warren Redfern 1000 Great West Road Brentford TW8 9DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/09] | Bankes, Stephen Charles Digby, et al BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 87307243.3 | 17.08.1987 | [1988/09] | Priority number, date | US19860897749 | 18.08.1986 Original published format: US 897749 | [1988/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0257950 | Date: | 02.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0257950 | Date: | 11.05.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61K37/43 | [1988/09] | CPC: |
A61K38/09 (EP,US);
Y10S930/13 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/09] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Induzieren des Gefiederwechsels von Vögeln | [1988/09] | English: | method of inducing birds to molt | [1988/09] | French: | Méthode pour faire muer les oiseaux | [1988/09] | File destroyed: | 26.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 07.11.1988 | Examination requested [1989/01] | 24.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/48] | 03.07.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1990/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1990 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0021234 (SYNTEX INC [US]); | [Y]EP0042753 (SYNTEX INC [US]); | [Y]EP0049628 (SYNTEX INC [US]); | [Y]EP0097031 (SYNTEX INC [US]); | [Y]EP0145258 (SYNTEX INC [US]); | [AP]CH659392 (DEBIOPHARM SA) | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 95, no. 7, 17th August 1981, page 73, abstract 55156x, Columbus, Ohio, US; JOHNSON et al.: "Hypothalamo-hypophySeal sensitivity to central injections of progesterone and LH-RM in the laying and molting hen", & ADV. PHISIOL. SCI., PROC. INT. CONGR. 28th 1980, (81), 99-107 |