EP0284683 - Apparatus for surface analysis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.05.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FISONS plc Fison House Princes Street Ipswich Suffolk IP1 1QH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/38] | For all designated states FISONS plc Fison House Princes Street Ipswich Suffolk IP1 1QH / GB | ||
Former [1988/40] | For all designated states VG INSTRUMENTS GROUP LIMITED 29 Brighton Road Crawley West Sussex RH10 6AE / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Waugh, Allen Robert 31 Kennedy Avenue East Grinstead West Sussex RH19 2DH / GB | [1988/40] | Representative(s) | Tomlinson, Kerry John, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/40] | Tomlinson, Kerry John, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. European Patent Attorneys Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 87307673.1 | 28.08.1987 | [1988/40] | Priority number, date | GB19870007516 | 30.03.1987 Original published format: GB 8707516 | [1988/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0284683 | Date: | 05.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0284683 | Date: | 07.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/252 | [1988/40] | CPC: |
H01J37/226 (EP,US);
H01J37/15 (EP,US);
H01J37/252 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/40] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Oberflächenanalyse | [1988/40] | English: | Apparatus for surface analysis | [1988/40] | French: | Dispositif pour analyser la surface | [1988/40] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 20.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/20] | 09.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 06.08.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 18.09.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.12.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/25] | 29.01.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1993/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1992 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]GB2002169 (LEYBOLD HERAEUS GMBH & CO KG) |