Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0260932 | Global Dossier | 08.11.1989 | A3 | EP0260932 | 23.03.1988 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP21879286 | 17.09.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0717004B | 01.03.1995 | B2 | JPS6374623 | 05.04.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | JP21879286 | 17.09.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4778374 | 18.10.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | JP21879286 | 17.09.1986 |