EP0260932 - Apparatus for forming tampon inserter tip [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.01.1992 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LION CORPORATION 3-7, Honjo 1-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/12] | For all designated states LION CORPORATION 3-7, Honjo 1-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takahashi, Kouji 2941-20, Kanaicho Machida-shi Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Muto, Yasutami 78-8, Akayamacho 3-chome Koshigaya-shi Saitama / JP | 03 /
Okino, Toru 13 Shimizucho 1-chome Hatano-shi Kanagawa / JP | [1988/12] | Representative(s) | Allam, Peter Clerk, et al Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/12] | Allam, Peter Clerk, et al LLOYD WISE, TREGEAR & CO. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R 0AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 87308148.3 | 15.09.1987 | [1988/12] | Priority number, date | JP19860218792 | 17.09.1986 Original published format: JP 21879286 | [1988/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0260932 | Date: | 23.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0260932 | Date: | 08.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B29C57/10, A61F13/20 | [1989/45] | CPC: |
A61F13/2085 (EP,US);
B29C31/002 (EP,US);
B29C51/18 (EP,US);
B29C57/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/12] | B29C57/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/12] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Formen des Endes eines Tamponeinführers | [1988/12] | English: | Apparatus for forming tampon inserter tip | [1988/12] | French: | Appareil pour former l'extrémité d'un tube d'insertion de tampons | [1988/12] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 09.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/18] | 05.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/09] | 20.09.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1991 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4302174 (HINZMANN ALFRED); | [Y]US2418155 (BORIS BOGOSLOWSKY); | [X]EP0158841 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [CH]); | [AD]JPS55166149 (YOSHINO KOGYOSHO CO LTD); | [AD]JPS5836553 (UNI CHARM CORP); | [A]CH315668 (TUBOPHANE S A R L [FR]); | [A]US3856143 (SIMON S, et al); | [A]US3752633 (LUNDBERG G) |