EP0260935 - Pneumatic actuator apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REXA CORPORATION 162 Farm Street Dover, MA 02030 / US | [1988/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Glomeau, Robert J. 162 Farm Street Dover Massachusetts 02030 / US | 02 /
Keith, Gareth A. 15 Old Orchard Road Sherborn Machusetts 01770 / US | [1988/12] | Representative(s) | Blatchford, William Michael, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/40] | Blatchford, William Michael, et al Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | ||
Former [1988/12] | Hughes, Brian Patrick Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 2BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 87308165.7 | 16.09.1987 | [1988/12] | Priority number, date | US19860908177 | 17.09.1986 Original published format: US 908177 | [1988/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0260935 | Date: | 23.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0260935 | Date: | 08.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0260935 | Date: | 09.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F15B11/12, F15B9/09 | [1989/06] | CPC: |
F15B11/128 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/12] | F15B11/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1988/12] | Title | German: | Gerät für ein pneumatisches Stellglied | [1988/12] | English: | Pneumatic actuator apparatus | [1988/12] | French: | Dispositif d'actionneur pneumatique | [1988/12] | Examination procedure | 07.08.1989 | Examination requested [1989/40] | 08.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 06.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 14.04.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 09.12.1992 | [2007/52] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 09.12.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH365233 (IBM [US]); | [A]US3382769 (RAIDER JERRY W); | [A]GB1160451 (COAL INDUSTRY PATENTS LTD [GB]); | [A]DE2365147 (DBA SA); | [A]FR2270468 (ALSTHOM CGEE [FR]); | [A]EP0040075 (FORD MOTOR CO [GB], et al) | [A] - SOVIET INVENTIONS ILLUSTRATED |