EP0260946 - A loaf slicing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.1993 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Omori Machinery Co., Ltd 2761 Nishikata Koshigaya-shi Saitama / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/12] | For all designated states Omori Machinery Co., Ltd 2761 Nishikata Koshigaya-shi Saitama / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yokokawa, Toshiyuki 13 Akabane-kita 3-chome Kita-ku Tokyo / JP | [1988/12] | Representative(s) | Boon, Graham Anthony, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/12] | Boon, Graham Anthony, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 87308188.9 | 16.09.1987 | [1988/12] | Priority number, date | JP19860141445 | 17.09.1986 Original published format: JP 14144586 | JP19860145862 | 25.09.1986 Original published format: JP 14586286 | JP19860170282 | 07.11.1986 Original published format: JP 17028286 | [1988/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0260946 | Date: | 23.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0260946 | Date: | 26.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0260946 | Date: | 05.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B26D1/15 | [1989/15] | CPC: |
B26D1/16 (EP,US);
B26D7/01 (EP,US);
B26D7/0625 (EP,US);
Y10T83/494 (EP,US);
Y10T83/6544 (EP,US);
Y10T83/6563 (EP,US);
Y10T83/6579 (EP,US);
Y10T83/739 (EP,US);
Y10T83/7573 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1988/12] | B26D1/29, B26D7/26 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1988/12] | Title | German: | Aufschnittmaschine | [1988/12] | English: | A loaf slicing machine | [1988/12] | French: | Trancheuse | [1988/12] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 21.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/35] | 03.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.02.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 05.08.1992 | CH | 05.08.1992 | DE | 05.08.1992 | FR | 05.08.1992 | IT | 05.08.1992 | LI | 05.08.1992 | NL | 05.08.1992 | GB | 05.11.1992 | [2007/52] |
Former [1999/42] | BE | 05.08.1992 | |
CH | 05.08.1992 | ||
DE | 05.08.1992 | ||
IT | 05.08.1992 | ||
LI | 05.08.1992 | ||
NL | 05.08.1992 | ||
GB | 05.11.1992 | ||
FR | 24.12.1992 | ||
Former [1993/48] | BE | 05.08.1992 | |
CH | 05.08.1992 | ||
DE | 05.08.1992 | ||
LI | 05.08.1992 | ||
NL | 05.08.1992 | ||
GB | 05.11.1992 | ||
FR | 24.12.1992 | ||
Former [1993/23] | BE | 05.08.1992 | |
CH | 05.08.1992 | ||
DE | 05.08.1992 | ||
LI | 05.08.1992 | ||
NL | 05.08.1992 | ||
FR | 24.12.1992 | ||
Former [1993/19] | BE | 05.08.1992 | |
CH | 05.08.1992 | ||
DE | 05.08.1992 | ||
LI | 05.08.1992 | ||
NL | 05.08.1992 | ||
Former [1993/15] | CH | 05.08.1992 | |
DE | 05.08.1992 | ||
LI | 05.08.1992 | ||
NL | 05.08.1992 | ||
Former [1993/10] | CH | 05.08.1992 | |
LI | 05.08.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2147405 (WALDNER KG H); | [A]US3842698 (FITCH C, et al); | [A]US3857475 (SMITH R); | [X]US4428263 (LINDEE SCOTT A [US], et al); | [AD]JPS59193695U |