EP0289679 - Silicone reactive/fluorescent silane dye compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.11.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAXTER TRAVENOL LABORATORIES, INC. One Baxter Parkway Deerfield, IL 60015 / US | [1988/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oviatt, Henry Wayne, Jr. Five Clover Lane Laguna Hills California 92656 / US | 02 /
Reich, Cary Jay 26502 Dapple Grey Laguna Hills California 92653 / US | [1988/45] | Representative(s) | Orchard, Oliver John JOHN ORCHARD & CO. Staple Inn Buildings North High Holborn London WC1V 7PZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/45] | Orchard, Oliver John JOHN ORCHARD & CO. Staple Inn Buildings North High Holborn London WC1V 7PZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 87308224.2 | 17.09.1987 | [1988/45] | Priority number, date | US19870047690 | 07.05.1987 Original published format: US 47690 | [1988/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0289679 | Date: | 09.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C09B3/00, // G01N33/52, G01N21/64, A61B5/14 | [1988/45] | CPC: |
C07F7/0805 (EP,US);
C07F7/1804 (EP,US);
C08K5/54 (EP,US);
C09B69/008 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/54, C08L83/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1988/45] | Title | German: | Silikon-reaktive fluoreszierende Silan-Farbstoff-Verbindungen | [1988/45] | English: | Silicone reactive/fluorescent silane dye compositions | [1988/45] | French: | Colorants fluorescents du type silane réactifs des silicones | [1988/45] | File destroyed: | 26.05.1995 | Examination procedure | 10.05.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/52] | 03.08.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1989/52] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3427273 [ ] (NEWING CHARLES W JR) |