EP0268356 - Electrical receptacle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.1993 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.1994 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 22.06.1994 [1994/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/21] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hahn, Marlyn Eugene 3065 Crooked Wind Lane York Pennsylvania 17404 / US | [1988/21] | Representative(s) | Boyes, Kenneth Aubrey, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/21] | Boyes, Kenneth Aubrey, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 87308229.1 | 17.09.1987 | [1988/21] | Priority number, date | US19860908341 | 17.09.1986 Original published format: US 908341 | US19870043821 | 29.04.1987 Original published format: US 43821 | [1988/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0268356 | Date: | 25.05.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0268356 | Date: | 13.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/11, H01R13/193, H01R13/428 | [1988/21] | CPC: |
H01R13/11 (EP,KR,US);
H01R13/193 (EP,US);
H01R13/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB [1988/21] | Title | German: | Elektrische Steckdose | [1988/21] | English: | Electrical receptacle | [1988/21] | French: | Douille électrique | [1988/21] | Examination procedure | 20.08.1988 | Examination requested [1988/43] | 22.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.01.1993 | [1994/25] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2236291 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]); | [A]DE2409662 (AMP INC); | [A]DE1465166 ; | [A]DE1790210 ; | [A]GB885040 (GEN ELECTRIC CO LTD, et al); | [A]DE923141 (OTTO DUNKEL GES MIT BESCHRAENK) |