EP0260999 - High pressure, high temperature polymerization of ethylene [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.1991 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.1991 | Change - withdrawal | published on 24.04.1991 [1991/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC. 1900 East Linden Avenue Linden New Jersey 07036-0710 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/12] | For all designated states EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC. 1900 East Linden Avenue Linden, New Jersey 07036-0710 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Welborn, Howard Curtis, Jr. 1952 Vermont Avenue Houston Texas 77019 / US | 02 /
Speed, Charles Stanley 4 Tucker Dayton Texas 77535 / US | [1988/12] | Representative(s) | Dew, Melvyn John, et al Exxon Chemical Limited Exxon Chemical Technology Centre P.O. Box 1 Abingdon Oxfordshire, OX13 6BB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/12] | Dew, Melvyn John, et al Exxon Chemical Limited Exxon Chemical Technology Centre P.O. Box 1 Abingdon Oxfordshire, OX13 6BB / GB | Application number, filing date | 87308359.6 | 21.09.1987 | [1988/12] | Priority number, date | US19860909752 | 19.09.1986 Original published format: US 909752 | US19870054785 | 04.06.1987 Original published format: US 54785 | US19870093460 | 10.09.1987 Original published format: US 93460 | [1988/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0260999 | Date: | 23.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C08F10/02, C08F4/64 | [1988/12] | CPC: |
C08F10/00 (EP);
C08F10/02 (EP);
C08F210/16 (EP);
C08F4/65912 (EP);
C08F4/6592 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F2/00 (EP);
C08F10/02, C08F4/65922 (EP);
C08F210/16, C08F210/14, C08F2500/07, C08F2500/03 (EP);
C08F210/16, C08F236/20, C08F2500/07, C08F2500/03 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1988/12] | Title | German: | Polymerisation von Ethylen bei hoher Temperatur und hohem Druck | [1988/12] | English: | High pressure, high temperature polymerization of ethylene | [1988/12] | French: | Polymérisation d'éthylène à haute température et haute pression | [1988/12] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 08.10.1987 | Examination requested [1988/12] | 20.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 25.02.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1991/17] | Request for further processing for: | 21.12.1990 | Request for further processing filed | 21.12.1990 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.10.1989 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   11.12.1989 | 01.10.1990 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.11.1990 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]DE3150270 (ERDOELCHEMIE GMBH [DE]); | [AD]EP0035242 ; | [AD]DE2608863 (BASF AG); | [AD]DE2608933 (BASF AG) |