EP0261966 - Raster input scanner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.10.1994 [1994/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/13] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tuhro, Richard Henry 1620 Lake Road Webster New York 14580 / US | [1988/13] | Representative(s) | Hill, Cecilia Ann, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/21] | Hill, Cecilia Ann, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | ||
Former [1989/05] | Frain, Timothy John Rank Xerox Limited Patent Department 364 Euston Road London NW1 3BL / GB | ||
Former [1988/13] | Frain, Timothy John Rank Xerox Limited Patent Department 364 Euston Road London NW1 3BL / GB | Application number, filing date | 87308460.2 | 24.09.1987 | [1988/13] | Priority number, date | US19860910713 | 24.09.1986 Original published format: US 910713 | [1988/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0261966 | Date: | 30.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0261966 | Date: | 06.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0261966 | Date: | 27.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/028, H04N1/18, H04N1/04 | [1989/34] | CPC: |
H04N1/00013 (EP,US);
H04N1/00002 (EP,US);
H04N1/00018 (EP,US);
H04N1/00031 (EP,US);
H04N1/00045 (EP,US);
H04N1/00053 (EP,US);
H04N1/00087 (EP,US);
H04N1/0009 (EP,US);
H04N1/02409 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1988/13] | H04N1/18, H04N1/028 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1988/13] | Title | German: | Rastereingangsabtaster | [1988/13] | English: | Raster input scanner | [1988/13] | French: | Dispositif d'analyse de trame d'entrée | [1988/13] | Examination procedure | 22.02.1990 | Examination requested [1990/16] | 23.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP58003371 ; | [A]JP56147274 ; | [A]US4268165 (BRADMON PAUL J); | [A]US4605970 (HAWKINS JEFFREY A [US]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 72 (E-166)[1217], 25th March 1983; & JP-A-58 003 371 (TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI K.K.) 10-01-1983, & JP58003371 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 27 (P-102)[905], 17th February 1982; & JP-A-56 147 274 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 16-11-1981, & JP56147274 A 00000000 |