EP0262908 - System for controlling a transfer clutch of a fourwheel drive vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.1993 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 07.07.1993 [1993/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fuji Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 7-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/14] | For all designated states FUJI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakakiyama, Ryuzo 1-21 Takamatsu Toshima-ku Tokyo / JP | [1988/14] | Representative(s) | Shindler, Nigel, et al Brookes Batchellor LLP 1 Boyne Park Tunbridge Wells Kent TN4 8EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/14] | Shindler, Nigel, et al BATCHELLOR, KIRK & CO. 2 Pear Tree Court Farringdon Road London EC1R 0DS / GB | Application number, filing date | 87308583.1 | 29.09.1987 | [1988/14] | Priority number, date | JP19860233485 | 30.09.1986 Original published format: JP 23348586 | [1988/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0262908 | Date: | 06.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0262908 | Date: | 02.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0262908 | Date: | 26.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B60K23/08 | [1988/14] | CPC: |
B60K23/0808 (EP,US);
B60W2540/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, LI, SE [1988/14] | Title | German: | Übertragungskupplungssteuersystem für ein vierradangetriebenes Fahrzeug | [1988/14] | English: | System for controlling a transfer clutch of a fourwheel drive vehicle | [1988/14] | French: | Système pour commander un accouplement de transfert d'un véhicule à entraînement sur les quatre roues | [1988/14] | Examination procedure | 19.10.1987 | Examination requested [1988/14] | 28.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.08.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.11.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 26.02.1992 | CH | 30.09.1992 | LI | 30.09.1992 | [1993/27] |
Former [1992/38] | SE | 26.02.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0076148 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]); | [A]GB2114252 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD); | [A]DE3312694 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]); | [X]DE3427725 (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG [DE]); | [A]US4552241 (SUZUKI KUNIHIKO [JP]); | [AD]US4576061 (YAMAKAWA TORU [JP], et al); | [A]DE3437435 (PORSCHE AG [DE]); | [A]DE3605489 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) |