EP0269225 - Thin film electrical devices with amorphous carbon electrodes and method of making same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.1990 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENERGY CONVERSION DEVICES, INC. 1675 West Maple Road Troy Michigan 48084 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/22] | For all designated states ENERGY CONVERSION DEVICES, INC. 1675 West Maple Road Troy Michigan 48084 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pryor, Roger W. 4918 Malibu Bloomfield Hills Michigan 48013 / US | 02 /
Ovshinsky, Stanford R. 2700 Squirrel Road Bloomfield Hills Michigan 48013 / US | 03 /
Formigoni, Napoleaon P. 570 Aspen Road Birmingham Michigan 48009 / US | [1988/22] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Peter Arthur, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/22] | Jackson, Peter Arthur, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 87308723.3 | 01.10.1987 | [1988/22] | Priority number, date | US19860936552 | 26.11.1986 Original published format: US 936552 | [1988/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0269225 | Date: | 01.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0269225 | Date: | 11.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H01L45/00, H01L29/40, H01L21/285 | [1989/43] | CPC: |
H10B63/80 (EP,US);
H10N70/20 (EP,US);
H10N70/026 (EP,US);
H10N70/063 (EP,US);
H10N70/231 (EP,US);
H10N70/823 (EP,US);
H10N70/826 (EP,US);
H10N70/841 (EP,US);
H10N70/882 (EP,US);
H10N70/8828 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1988/22] | H01L29/40, H01L21/285 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/22] | Title | German: | Elektronische Dünnschichtschaltungen mit Elektroden aus amorphen Kohlenstoff sowie Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [1988/22] | English: | Thin film electrical devices with amorphous carbon electrodes and method of making same | [1988/22] | French: | Dispositifs électroniques à couche mince ayant des électrodes en carbone amorphe et procédé pour leur fabrication | [1988/22] | File destroyed: | 29.01.1999 | Examination procedure | 02.05.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/43] | 31.05.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1990/43] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 08.05.1990 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1989 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3886577 (BUCKLEY WILLIAM D); | [A]WO8301153 (INTERFACES 15 [FR]); | [A]US4433342 (PATEL VIPIN N [US], et al) |