EP0271186 - Hydroxyindoles and their use in dyeing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REPLIGEN CORPORATION One Kendall Square Building 700 Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [1992/46] |
Former [1988/24] | For all designated states REPLIGEN CORPORATION 101 Binney Street Cambridge Massachusetts 02142 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carroll, James 113 Webster Avenue Cambridge, MA 02141 / US | 02 /
Millis, Cynthia D. 3720 8th Avenue, Apt. 5 Vancouver, BC, V6R 1Z3 / CA | 03 /
Herlihy, Walter C. 5 Ray Street Beverly, MA 01915 / US | [1993/01] |
Former [1988/24] | 01 /
Carroll, James 113 Webster Avenue Cambridge Massachusetts 02141 / US | ||
02 /
Millis, Cynthia D. 3720 8th Avenue Apt. 5 Vancouver British Columbia, V6R 1Z3 / CA | |||
03 /
Herlihy, Walter C. 5 Ray Street Beverly Massachusetts 01915 / US | Representative(s) | Perry, Robert Edward, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/24] | Perry, Robert Edward, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 87308724.1 | 01.10.1987 | [1988/24] | Priority number, date | US19860933649 | 21.11.1986 Original published format: US 933649 | [1988/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0271186 | Date: | 15.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0271186 | Date: | 30.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/13 | [1988/24] | CPC: |
A61K8/492 (EP,KR,US);
A61Q5/10 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2800/43 (KR);
A61K2800/52 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/24] | Title | German: | Hydroxyindole und ihre Anwendung als Färbemittel | [1988/24] | English: | Hydroxyindoles and their use in dyeing | [1988/24] | French: | Hydroxyindoles et leur application comme colorant | [1988/24] | Examination procedure | 13.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/06] | 18.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.04.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1991 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   25.03.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.12.1992 | BE | 30.12.1992 | CH | 30.12.1992 | DE | 30.12.1992 | FR | 30.12.1992 | GR | 30.12.1992 | IT | 30.12.1992 | LI | 30.12.1992 | NL | 30.12.1992 | SE | 30.12.1992 | ES | 10.04.1993 | [2004/35] |
Former [2004/03] | AT | 30.12.1992 | |
BE | 30.12.1992 | ||
CH | 30.12.1992 | ||
DE | 30.12.1992 | ||
GR | 30.12.1992 | ||
IT | 30.12.1992 | ||
LI | 30.12.1992 | ||
NL | 30.12.1992 | ||
SE | 30.12.1992 | ||
ES | 10.04.1993 | ||
FR | 21.05.1993 | ||
Former [2000/04] | AT | 30.12.1992 | |
BE | 30.12.1992 | ||
CH | 30.12.1992 | ||
DE | 30.12.1992 | ||
GR | 30.12.1992 | ||
IT | 30.12.1992 | ||
LI | 30.12.1992 | ||
NL | 30.12.1992 | ||
SE | 30.12.1992 | ||
FR | 21.05.1993 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 30.12.1992 | |
BE | 30.12.1992 | ||
CH | 30.12.1992 | ||
DE | 30.12.1992 | ||
IT | 30.12.1992 | ||
LI | 30.12.1992 | ||
NL | 30.12.1992 | ||
SE | 30.12.1992 | ||
FR | 21.05.1993 | ||
Former [1994/49] | AT | 30.12.1992 | |
BE | 30.12.1992 | ||
CH | 30.12.1992 | ||
DE | 30.12.1992 | ||
LI | 30.12.1992 | ||
NL | 30.12.1992 | ||
SE | 30.12.1992 | ||
FR | 21.05.1993 | ||
Former [1994/25] | AT | 30.12.1992 | |
BE | 30.12.1992 | ||
CH | 30.12.1992 | ||
DE | 30.12.1992 | ||
LI | 30.12.1992 | ||
NL | 30.12.1992 | ||
SE | 30.12.1992 | ||
FR | 21.05.1993 | ||
Former [1993/49] | BE | 30.12.1992 | |
CH | 30.12.1992 | ||
DE | 30.12.1992 | ||
LI | 30.12.1992 | ||
NL | 30.12.1992 | ||
SE | 30.12.1992 | ||
FR | 21.05.1993 | ||
Former [1993/40] | BE | 30.12.1992 | |
CH | 30.12.1992 | ||
DE | 30.12.1992 | ||
LI | 30.12.1992 | ||
NL | 30.12.1992 | ||
SE | 30.12.1992 | ||
Former [1993/38] | BE | 30.12.1992 | |
CH | 30.12.1992 | ||
LI | 30.12.1992 | ||
NL | 30.12.1992 | ||
SE | 30.12.1992 | ||
Former [1993/28] | CH | 30.12.1992 | |
LI | 30.12.1992 | ||
SE | 30.12.1992 | ||
Former [1993/27] | CH | 30.12.1992 | |
LI | 30.12.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP78130443 ; | [Y]DE2455376 (SHISEIDO CO LTD); | [A]US4515773 (HERLIHY WALTER C [US]); | [YD]EP0161073 (REPLIGEN CORP [US]); | [A]US4609544 (HERLIHY WALTER C [US]) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 90, no. 12, 19th March 1979, page 293, abstract no. 92263x, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-78 130 443 (SHISEIDO CO., LTD) 14-11-1978, & JP78130443 A 00000000 |