EP0263675 - Gold conductor composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENGELHARD CORPORATION Menlo Park, CN 40 Edison New Jersey 08818 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/15] | For all designated states ENGELHARD CORPORATION Menlo Park, CN 40 Edison New Jersey 08818 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hsu, King F. 29 Oak Hill Drive Wayne New Jersey 07470 / US | 02 /
Twerski, Isaac M. 1609 46th Street Brooklyn New York 11204 / US | 03 /
Castillo, Imelda L. 3 Barclay Court Somerset New Jersey 08873 / US | [1988/15] | Representative(s) | Fisher, Adrian John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/15] | Fisher, Adrian John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 87308836.3 | 06.10.1987 | [1988/15] | Priority number, date | US19860915850 | 06.10.1986 Original published format: US 915850 | [1988/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0263675 | Date: | 13.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0263675 | Date: | 31.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H01B1/16 | [1988/15] | CPC: |
H05K1/092 (EP);
H01L21/28 (KR);
H01B1/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/15] | Title | German: | Leitfähige Goldzusammenstellung | [1988/15] | English: | Gold conductor composition | [1988/15] | French: | Composition conductrice contenant de l'or | [1988/15] | File destroyed: | 15.05.1995 | Examination procedure | 11.04.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/44] | 06.06.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1989/44] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2142646 (ATOMIC ENERGY AUTHORITY UK); | [A]US4235944 (FELTEN JOHN J [US]); | [A]EP0009245 (DU PONT [US]) |