EP0269231 - Recovery of heavy oil [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.10.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The British Petroleum Company p.l.c. Britannic House Moor Lane London EC2Y 9BU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/22] | For all designated states The British Petroleum Company p.l.c. Britannic House Moor Lane London EC2Y 9BU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stockwell, Alan The british Petroleum Company p.l.c. Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB | 02 /
Taylor, Alisatair Stewart The british Petroleum Company p.l.c. Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB | [1988/22] | Representative(s) | MacLeod, Malcolm, et al BP INTERNATIONAL LIMITED Patents Division Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/22] | MacLeod, Malcolm, et al BP INTERNATIONAL LIMITED Patents Division Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB | Application number, filing date | 87308937.9 | 08.10.1987 | [1988/22] | Priority number, date | GB19860025933 | 30.10.1986 Original published format: GB 8625933 | [1988/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0269231 | Date: | 01.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C10G1/04, C10C3/08 | [1988/22] | CPC: |
C10G1/00 (EP);
C10C3/007 (EP);
C10G1/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1988/22] | Title | German: | Gewinnung von Schweröl | [1988/22] | English: | Recovery of heavy oil | [1988/22] | French: | Récupération d'huile lourde | [1988/22] | File destroyed: | 27.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 29.11.1988 | Examination requested [1989/04] | 10.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1990/51] | 26.09.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4409091 [ ]; | US4549935 [ ] |