Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB8624427D0 | 12.11.1986 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB8624427 | 11.10.1986 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB8631093D0 | 04.02.1987 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB8631093 | 31.12.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0265132 | Global Dossier | 17.07.1991 | B1 | EP0265132 | 27.04.1988 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB8624427 | 11.10.1986 | GB8631093 | 31.12.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3771434D1 | 22.08.1991 | D1 | Priority number | Date | GB8624427 | 11.10.1986 | GB8631093 | 31.12.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4944644 | 31.07.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8624427 | 11.10.1986 | GB8631093 | 31.12.1986 |