EP0265132 - Screw fastener cap [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.1992 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STEELPRESS LIMITED 46 Helen Street, Govan Glasgow G51 3HQ / GB | [1990/38] |
Former [1988/17] | For all designated states Steelpress (Supplies) Limited 46 Helen Street Glasgow G51 3HQ Scotland / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bell, Alan Steelpress (Supplies) Limited 46 Helen Street Glasgow G51 3HQ / GB | [1988/17] | Representative(s) | Arthur, John William, et al FITZPATRICKS, 4 West Regent Street Glasgow G2 1RS Scotland / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/17] | Arthur, John William, et al FITZPATRICKS, 4 West Regent Street Glasgow G2 1RS, Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 87308988.2 | 12.10.1987 | [1988/17] | Priority number, date | GB19860024427 | 11.10.1986 Original published format: GB 8624427 | GB19860031093 | 31.12.1986 Original published format: GB 8631093 | [1988/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0265132 | Date: | 27.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0265132 | Date: | 17.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F16B37/14 | [1988/17] | CPC: |
E04D3/3606 (EP,US);
F16B37/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/17] | Title | German: | Schraubenabdeckung | [1988/17] | English: | Screw fastener cap | [1988/17] | French: | Capuchon pour une vis | [1988/17] | Examination procedure | 27.10.1988 | Examination requested [1988/52] | 12.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.12.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1990 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.12.1990 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 17.07.1991 | FR | 17.07.1991 | IT | 17.07.1991 | NL | 17.07.1991 | SE | 17.07.1991 | ES | 28.10.1991 | CH | 31.10.1991 | LI | 31.10.1991 | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/03] | BE | 17.07.1991 | |
IT | 17.07.1991 | ||
NL | 17.07.1991 | ||
SE | 17.07.1991 | ||
ES | 28.10.1991 | ||
CH | 31.10.1991 | ||
LI | 31.10.1991 | ||
FR | 06.12.1991 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 17.07.1991 | |
IT | 17.07.1991 | ||
NL | 17.07.1991 | ||
SE | 17.07.1991 | ||
CH | 31.10.1991 | ||
LI | 31.10.1991 | ||
FR | 06.12.1991 | ||
Former [1992/33] | BE | 17.07.1991 | |
NL | 17.07.1991 | ||
SE | 17.07.1991 | ||
CH | 31.10.1991 | ||
LI | 31.10.1991 | ||
FR | 06.12.1991 | ||
Former [1992/32] | BE | 17.07.1991 | |
NL | 17.07.1991 | ||
SE | 17.07.1991 | ||
FR | 06.12.1991 | ||
Former [1992/25] | NL | 17.07.1991 | |
SE | 17.07.1991 | ||
FR | 06.12.1991 | ||
Former [1992/10] | NL | 17.07.1991 | |
SE | 17.07.1991 | ||
Former [1992/09] | NL | 17.07.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1861316U (HARRISON BIRMINGHAM LTD [GB]); | [A]DE1967486U (ROBERTSON CO H H [US]); | [A]DE7121067U ; | [A]GB916161 (SIDNEY GEOFFREY YOUNG); | [A]US3125190 | Examination | EP0153487 |