EP0265210 - Phase-shift keyed carrier recovery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.01.1993 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRITISH AEROSPACE PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY Warwick House, P.O. Box 87, Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough Hants. GU14 6YU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/45] | For all designated states BRITISH AEROSPACE PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY Warwick House, P.O. Box 87, Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough, Hants. GU14 6YU / GB | ||
Former [1988/17] | For all designated states BRITISH AEROSPACE PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY Warwick House, P.O. Box 87, Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough, Hants. GU14 6YU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Biggs, Roger Tredegar c/o Box 115 British Aerospace PLC Downshire Way Bracknell Berkshire RG12 1QL / GB | 02 /
Goodchild, Edward Jeffrey George c/o Box 115 British Aerospace PLC Downshire Way Bracknell Berkshire RG12 1QL / GB | 03 /
Standford, Richard Thomas Albert c/o Box 115 British Aerospace PLC Downshire Way Bracknell Berkshire RG12 1QL / GB | [1988/17] | Representative(s) | Rackham, Stephen Neil, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/17] | Rackham, Stephen Neil, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 87309224.1 | 19.10.1987 | [1988/17] | Priority number, date | GB19860025117 | 20.10.1986 Original published format: GB 8625117 | [1988/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0265210 | Date: | 27.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0265210 | Date: | 11.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/22 | [1988/17] | CPC: |
H04L27/2276 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1988/17] | Title | German: | PSK-Trägerrückgewinnung | [1988/17] | English: | Phase-shift keyed carrier recovery | [1988/17] | French: | Récupération de porteuse d'un signal modulé en PSK | [1988/17] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 29.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/22] | 10.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/08] | 18.09.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.11.1991 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   11.02.1992 | 02.11.1992 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR961743 ; | [A]US4412302 (NOSSEN EDWARD J [US]); | [A]EP0190583 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) | [A] - INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS 1974, Minneapolis, 17th-19th June 1974, pages 43B-1 - 43B-5, IEEE, New York, US; F.M. GARDNER; "Comparison of QPSK carrier regenerator for TDMA application" |