EP0266120 - Generating an array of light spots having uniform intensity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.03.1991 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1988/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Streibl, Norbert 3304 Willow Drive Ocean Township New Jersey 07712 / US | [1988/18] | Representative(s) | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/18] | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr., et al AT&T (UK) Ltd. 5, Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 87309293.6 | 21.10.1987 | [1988/18] | Priority number, date | US19860926355 | 31.10.1986 Original published format: US 926355 | [1988/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0266120 | Date: | 04.05.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0266120 | Date: | 11.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/00, G02B27/18, G02B27/42, G02B3/00 | [1990/25] | CPC: |
G02B27/0927 (EP);
G02B27/09 (EP);
G02B27/0944 (EP);
G02B27/106 (EP);
G02B27/1093 (EP);
G02B3/0056 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1988/18] | G02B27/00, G02B27/18 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1988/18] | Title | German: | Erzeugung einer Anordnung von Lichtpunkten gleicher Intensität | [1988/18] | English: | Generating an array of light spots having uniform intensity | [1988/18] | French: | Génération d'une matrice de points lumineux ayant une intensité uniforme | [1988/18] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 06.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/06] | 04.02.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1991/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4619508 ; | [A]GB1546513 ; | [A]DE1572805 | [X] - K. MUETZE: "ABC DER OPTIK" 1961, Verlag Werner Dausien, Hanau, D | [X] - APPLIED OPTICS, vol. 22, no. 10, May 1983, pages 1497-1507, New York, US; W.B. VELDKAMP et al.: "Binary holographic LO beam multiplexer for IR imaging detector arrays". | [T] - APPLIED OPTICS, vol. 21, no. 23, 1 December 1982, pages 4368-4372, New York, US; D. JOYEUX et al.: "Optical Fourier transform: what is the optimal setup?". |