EP0266153 - Ion exchange materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.1992 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.11.1992 [1992/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states British Nuclear Fuels PLC Risley Warrington Cheshire WA3 6AS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/18] | For all designated states British Nuclear Fuels PLC Risley Warrington Cheshire, WA3 6AS / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
White, David Anthony 150 Highlever Road London W10 6PJ / GB | 02 /
Donson, Paul Flat 2 Davey House 7A Red Lion Lane Shooters Hill London SE18 4GJ / GB | [1988/18] | Representative(s) | Owen, Geoffrey John, et al c/o British Nuclear Fuels Plc Patent Section Legal Department Risley, Warrington Cheshire WA3 6AS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/12] | Owen, Geoffrey John, et al c/o British Nuclear Fuels Plc Patent Section Legal Department Risley, Warrington Cheshire WA3 6AS / GB | ||
Former [1991/13] | Owen, Geoffrey John Patents Branch United Kingdom Atomic Energy Authority Northern ResearchLaboratories Risley Warrington Cheshire WA3 6AT / GB | ||
Former [1988/18] | Owen, Geoffrey John United Kingdom Atomic Energy Authority Patents Deapartment Building 329 Harwell Laboratory Oxfordshire OX11 0RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 87309429.6 | 26.10.1987 | [1988/18] | Priority number, date | GB19860025657 | 27.10.1986 Original published format: GB 8625657 | [1988/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0266153 | Date: | 04.05.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0266153 | Date: | 31.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0266153 | Date: | 04.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B01J39/02, B01J39/10, G21F9/12 | [1988/18] | CPC: |
G21F9/12 (EP,US);
B01J39/02 (EP,US);
B01J39/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1988/18] | Title | German: | Ionenaustauschmaterialien | [1988/18] | English: | Ion exchange materials | [1988/18] | French: | Matériaux échangeurs d'ions | [1988/18] | Examination procedure | 24.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/17] | 19.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.01.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.05.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.09.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1120208 (JAPAN ATOMIC ENERGY RES INST); | [A]DE1564656 (SARTORIUS MEMBRANFILTER GMBH); | [A]WO8402089 (MACEDO & LITOVITZ [US]) | [X] - GMELIN HANDBUCH DER ANORGANISCHEN CHEMIE, 8th edition, "Uran", vol. C2, 1978, pages 252-259, Springer-Verlag, Berlin, DE |