EP0271982 - Positive-positioning knob assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.04.1992 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DICKEY-JOHN CORPORATION 15.5 Country Club Road Auburn Illinois 62615 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/25] | For all designated states DICKEY-JOHN CORPORATION 15.5 Country Club Road Auburn Illinois 62615 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gorsek, Edmund John 13 Westwood Terrace Springfield Illinois 62702 / US | [1988/25] | Representative(s) | Carpenter, David, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/25] | Carpenter, David, et al MARKS & CLERK, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 87309450.2 | 26.10.1987 | [1988/25] | Priority number, date | US19860941378 | 15.12.1986 Original published format: US 941378 | [1988/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0271982 | Date: | 22.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0271982 | Date: | 21.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G05G5/18, G05G1/10 | [1988/25] | CPC: |
G05G5/18 (EP,US);
G05G1/082 (EP,US);
G05G5/12 (EP,US);
H01H3/20 (EP,US);
Y10S16/30 (US);
Y10T74/2084 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1988/25] | Title | German: | Drehknopf mit formschlüssiger Rastung | [1988/25] | English: | Positive-positioning knob assembly | [1988/25] | French: | Bouton à positionnement par engrènement | [1988/25] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 28.11.1981 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/22] | 20.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/21] | 17.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.11.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/25] | 30.12.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1991 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB708438 (NAT RES DEV); | [X]US2849891 (MILLS HERBERT E); | [X]US2899841 ; | [A]DE1927901 (SEL KONTAKT BAUELEMENTE GMBH); | [Y]US4077503 (LIEBERMAN LESTER, et al) |