EP0266170 - Peptide derivative and its production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.04.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takeda Chemical Industries, Ltd. 1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka / JP | [1992/40] |
Former [1989/46] | For all designated states TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-fu / JP | ||
Former [1988/18] | For all designated states Takeda Chemical Industries, Ltd. 1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujino, Masahiko 10-7, Hibarigaoka 2-chome Takarazuka Hyogo 665 / JP | 02 /
Wakimasu, Mitsuhiro B-510, 17 Yamatecho 3-chome Suita Osaka 564 / JP | 03 /
Nishikawa, Kohei 5-19, Oharano-kamisatotorimicho Nishikyo-ku Kyoto 610-11 / JP | [1988/18] | Representative(s) | Lewin, John Harvey, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/18] | Lewin, John Harvey, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 87309481.7 | 27.10.1987 | [1988/18] | Priority number, date | JP19860257179 | 28.10.1986 Original published format: JP 25717986 | [1988/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0266170 | Date: | 04.05.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0266170 | Date: | 11.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/10, A61K37/02, C07K1/00 | [1988/18] | CPC: |
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/02 (EP);
C07K14/58 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/18] | Title | German: | Peptidderivat und seine Produktion | [1988/18] | English: | Peptide derivative and its production | [1988/18] | French: | Dérivé d'un peptide, et sa production | [1988/18] | File destroyed: | 04.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 12.10.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/22] | 04.01.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 06.11.1990 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1990 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0173557 (AJINOMOTO KK [JP]); | [A]WO8504872 (SALK INST FOR BIOLOGICAL STUDI [US]); | [XP]EP0223143 (BIOTECHNOLOGY RES ASS [US]) | [Y] - BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, vol. 138, no. 2, 31st July 1986, pages 880-886, Academic PressInc.; P.W. SCHILLER et al.: "Synthesis and activity profiles of atrial natriuretic peptide (ANP) analogs with reduced ring size" | [Y] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE 22ND SYMPOSIUM ON PEPTIDE CHEMISTRY, vol. 22, 1984pages 241-246; N. CHINO et al.: "Syntheses of alpha-human atrial natriuretic polypeptide(alpha-hANP) and its related peptides" |