EP0274199 - Coupling of optical fibres to optical waveguides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.1993 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.05.1993 [1993/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BICC Public Limited Company Devonshire House Mayfair Place London W1X 5FH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/28] | For all designated states BICC Public Limited Company Devonshire House Mayfair Place London W1X 5FH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Keene, Ian William 59, Selworthy Road Battersea London, SW11 3NG / GB | [1988/28] | Representative(s) | Ross Gower, Edward Lewis, et al BICC plc Patents & Licensing Department Quantum House Maylands Avenue Hemel Hempstead, Herts. HP2 4SJ / GB | [1988/28] | Application number, filing date | 87309916.2 | 10.11.1987 | [1988/28] | Priority number, date | GB19860026816 | 10.11.1986 Original published format: GB 8626816 | [1988/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0274199 | Date: | 13.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0274199 | Date: | 27.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0274199 | Date: | 13.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/26, G02B6/36, G02B6/30 | [1988/29] | CPC: |
G02B6/4212 (EP);
G02B6/30 (EP);
G02B6/3803 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1988/28] | G02B6/36, G02B6/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/25] |
Former [1988/28] | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE | Title | German: | Kupplung zwischen optischen Fasern und optischen Wellenleitern | [1988/28] | English: | Coupling of optical fibres to optical waveguides | [1988/28] | French: | Couplage entre fibres optiques et guides d'ondes optiques | [1988/28] | Examination procedure | 09.11.1988 | Examination requested [1989/02] | 07.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.08.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 13.02.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/18] | Request for further processing for: | 21.02.1992 | Request for further processing filed | 13.02.1992 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.03.1992 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0170457 (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB]) | [A] - IEE PROCEEDINGS SECTION, vol. 132, no. 5, Part J, October 1985, pages 291-296, Stevenage, Herts, GB; J.P.G. BRISTOW et al.: "Locating and coupling fibres to integrated stripe waveguides" | [A] - IEEE JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY, vol. LT-3, no. 4, August 1985, pages 795-798, New York, US; E.J. MURPHY et al.: "Permanent attachment of single-mode fiber arrays to waveguides" |