EP0276548 - Chocolate additive, chocolate containing the same and process for producing such chocolate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.06.1991 [1991/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meiji Seika Kaisha Ltd. 4-16, Kyobashi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8002 / JP | For all designated states FUJI OIL COMPANY, LIMITED No. 6-1, Hachiman-cho Minami-ku Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/31] | For all designated states MEIJI SEIKA KAISHA LTD. 4-16 Kyobashi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104 / JP | ||
For all designated states FUJI OIL COMPANY, LIMITED No. 6-1, Hachiman-cho Minami-ku Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koyano, Tetsuo c/o Dai-2-Baikaso 403, No. 194 Totehoncho 2-chome Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Izumi, Tsugio No. 218-400, Oaza-Ogaido Kumatori-cho Sennan-gun Osaka-fu / JP | 03 /
Sagi, Nobuo No. 2-17, Otorinaka-machi 8-cho Sakai-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 04 /
Fujita, Setsuya No. 1535-15, Takada-cho Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 05 /
Murata, Tadahiko No. 39-3, Nagatakita 3-chome Minami-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 06 /
Mori, Hiroyuki No. 4-2, Wakamatsudai 2-cho Sakai-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 07 /
Hachiya, Iwao No. 9-14, Nakazato 1-chome Minami-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1988/31] | Representative(s) | Bizley, Richard Edward, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/31] | Bizley, Richard Edward, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 87309981.6 | 11.11.1987 | [1988/31] | Priority number, date | JP19860269393 | 11.11.1986 Original published format: JP 26939386 | JP19870136530 | 29.05.1987 Original published format: JP 13653087 | [1988/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0276548 | Date: | 03.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0276548 | Date: | 13.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A23G1/00, A23G1/04 | [1988/31] | CPC: |
A23G1/36 (EP,US);
A23G1/042 (EP,US);
A23G1/305 (EP,US);
A23G1/56 (EP,US);
A23G2200/08 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A23G1/305, A23G2200/08 (EP,US);
A23G1/56, A23G2200/08 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1988/31] | Title | German: | Schokoladezusatz, diesen enthaltende Schokolade und ihr Herstellungsverfahren | [1988/31] | English: | Chocolate additive, chocolate containing the same and process for producing such chocolate | [1988/31] | French: | Additif pour chocolat, chocolat le contenant et procédé de fabrication d'un tel chocolat | [1988/31] | Examination procedure | 09.09.1988 | Examination requested [1988/44] | 19.01.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.07.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.12.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]EP0196780 (KAO CORP [JP]); | [Y]FR2334747 (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG [DE]); | [A]GB1102944 (NESTLE SA); | [A]GB893337 (DANSK SOJAKAGEFABRIK AS) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 78, no. 9, 5th March 1973, page 388, abstract no. 56686f, Columbus, Ohio, US; F.B. PADLEY et al.: "Improving chocolates by the use of the monounsaturated triglycerides SOS [2-oleo-1,3-distearin] and POS [2-oleo-3-palmito-1-stearin]", & REV. INT. CHOC. 1972, 27(10), 278-80 |