EP0269343 - Air separation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.1992 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.06.1992 [1992/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The BOC Group plc Chertsey Road Windlesham Surrey GU20 6HJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/22] | For all designated states The BOC Group plc Chertsey Road Windlesham Surrey GU20 6HJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rathbone, Thomas 139 Brettenham Road Walthamstow London E17 5AZ / GB | [1988/22] | Representative(s) | Wickham, Michael, et al C/o Patent and Trademark Department The BOC Group plc Chertsey Road Windlesham Surrey GU20 6HJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/22] | Wickham, Michael, et al c/o Patent and Trademark Department The BOC Group plc Chertsey Road Windlesham Surrey GU20 6HJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 87310110.9 | 16.11.1987 | [1988/22] | Priority number, date | GB19860028018 | 24.11.1986 Original published format: GB 8628018 | GB19870007994 | 03.04.1987 Original published format: GB 8707994 | [1988/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0269343 | Date: | 01.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0269343 | Date: | 01.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0269343 | Date: | 12.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F25J3/04 | [1988/22] | CPC: |
F25J3/0429 (EP,US);
F25J3/04309 (EP,US);
F25J3/04315 (EP,US);
F25J3/04412 (EP,US);
F25J3/0446 (EP,US);
F25J3/04672 (EP,US);
F25J3/04678 (EP,US);
F25J3/04872 (EP,US);
F25J2200/06 (EP,US);
F25J2200/54 (EP,US);
F25J2205/02 (EP,US);
F25J2235/50 (EP,US);
F25J2245/40 (EP,US);
F25J2250/02 (EP);
F25J2250/20 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, NL [1988/22] | Title | German: | Luftverflüssigung | [1988/22] | English: | Air separation | [1988/22] | French: | Séparation de l'air | [1988/22] | Examination procedure | 21.08.1989 | Examination requested [1989/42] | 12.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.12.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2304976 (LINDE AG); | [Y]DE2548222 (LINDE AG); | [A]EP0202843 (BOC GROUP PLC [GB]); | [AP]EP0241817 (LINDE AG [DE]) | Examination | EP0218467 |