EP0270278 - Use of metal salts with superpolyamides as oxymethylene polymer stabilizers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST CELANESE CORPORATION Route 202-206 North Somerville, N.J. 08876 / US | [1988/29] |
Former [1988/23] | For all designated states CELANESE ENGINEERING RESINS, INC. 26 Main Street Chatham, New Jersey / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Paul, James L. 24 Sweetbriar Road Summit New Jersey / US | 02 /
Auerbach, Andrew B. 23 Orchard Lane Livingstone New Jersey / US | [1988/23] | Representative(s) | De Minvielle-Devaux, Ian Benedict Peter, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | [1988/23] | Application number, filing date | 87310156.2 | 18.11.1987 | [1988/23] | Priority number, date | US19860932235 | 18.11.1986 Original published format: US 932235 | [1988/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0270278 | Date: | 08.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C08L59/02, C08K5/09, C08K5/05 | [1988/23] | CPC: |
C08K5/098 (EP,US);
C08L61/00 (KR);
C08L59/00 (EP,US);
C08L59/02 (KR);
C08L77/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/098, C08L59/00 (EP,US);
C08L59/00, C08L77/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/23] | Title | German: | Verwendung von Metallsalzen mit Superpolyamiden als Oxymethylenpolymer-Stabilisatoren | [1988/23] | English: | Use of metal salts with superpolyamides as oxymethylene polymer stabilizers | [1988/23] | French: | Utilisation de sels de métal avec des superpolyamides comme stabilisateurs de polymères d'oxyméthylène | [1988/23] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 12.11.1988 | Examination requested [1989/02] | 12.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/42] | 22.05.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3699062 (STARR LEON, et al); | [AD]US3488303 (HEINZ WALTER E); | [AD]US3484400 (HALEK GEORGE WALTER); | [AD]US3484399 (KAKOS MICHAEL J JR) |