EP0270290 - Method and compositions for reducing neurotoxic injury [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR UNIVERSITY 350 Cambridge Avenue, Suite 250 Palo Alto California 94306 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/23] | For all designated states THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR UNIVERSITY 350 Cambridge Avenue, Suite 250 Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Choi, Dennis W. 739 San Rafael Place Stanford California 94305 / US | [1988/23] | Representative(s) | Harrison, David Christopher, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/28] | Harrison, David Christopher, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [1988/23] | Harrison, David Christopher MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 87310323.8 | 23.11.1987 | [1988/23] | Priority number, date | US19860934733 | 25.11.1986 Original published format: US 934733 | [1988/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0270290 | Date: | 08.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0270290 | Date: | 03.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/415 | [1992/23] | CPC: |
A61K31/485 (EP,KR,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P3/08 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1988/23] | A61K31/485 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/23] | Title | German: | Methode und Präparate zur Reduzierung neurotoxischer Schäden | [1988/23] | English: | Method and compositions for reducing neurotoxic injury | [1988/23] | French: | Méthode et compositions pour la réduction de blessure neurotoxique | [1988/23] | Examination procedure | 25.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/03] | 11.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.12.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 24.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.1995 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.04.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 02.04.1996 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 30.07.1998 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/23] | Appeal following examination | 10.06.1996 | Appeal received No. T0837/96 | 09.08.1996 | Statement of grounds filed | 22.05.1998 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1998/21] | 29.07.1998 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Request for further processing for: | 24.02.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 28.02.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.03.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1998 | 12   M06   Not yet paid | 30.11.2001 | 15   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]WO8701036 (UNIV NEW YORK [US]); | [YP]EP0230370 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [GB]) | [X] - BRAIN RES., vol. 383, nos. 1-2, 24th September 1986, pages 314-318; F.C. TORTELLA et al.: "Dextromethorphan and carbetapentane: centrally acting non-opioid antitussive agents with novel anticonvulsant properties" | [Y] - BIOCHEM. PHARMACOL., vol. 33, no. 23, 1st December 1984, pages 3829-3832, Pergamon Press Ltd, GB; S.C. BERRY et al.: "Benz(f)isoquinolines as excitatory amino acid antagonists: an indication of their mechanism of action?" | [Y] - THE LANCET, 20th July 1985, pages 140-143; R. SCHWARCZ: "Exitatory aminoacid antagonists provide a therapeutic approach to neurological disorders" | [Y] - CLINICAL SCIENCE, vol. 68, 1985, pages 113-122; B. MELDRUM: "Possible therapeutic applications of antagonists of excitatory anino acid neurotransmitters" | [YD] - EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, vol. 111, no. 2, 8th May 1985, pages 185-190, Elsevier Science Publishers B.V.; H. CHURCH et al.: "Differential effects of dextrorphan and levorphanol on the excitation of rat spinal neurons by amino acids" | [Y] - SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE ABSTRACTS, vol. 12, no. 1, 1986, page 64; M.P. GOLDBERG et al.: "Hypoxic cortical neuronal injury is blocked by N-methyl-D-aspartate receptor antagonists" | [YD] - SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE ABSTRACTS, vol. 12, no. 1, 1986, pages 381; D.W. CHOI et al.: "Glutamate neurotoxicity in cortical cell culture is attenuated by N-methyl-D-aspartate receptor antagonists" | [X] - SCIENCE; vol. 215, no. 4528, 1st January 1982, pages 69-71; AAAS; Y. HOSOBUCHI et al.: "Reversal of induced ischemic neurologic deficit in gerbils by the opiate antagonist naloxone" | [XP] - NEUROSCIENCE LETTERS, vol. 80, 11th September 1987, pages 11-15, Elsevier Scientific Publishers Ireland Ltd; M.P. GOLDBERG et al.: "Dextrorphan and dextromethorphan attenuate hypoxic injury in neuronal culture" | [T] - CLINICAL NEUROPHARMACOLOGY, vol. 12, no. 4, August 1989, pages 322-330, Raven Press, Ltd, New York, US; F.O. WALKER et al.: "An open label trial of dextromethorphan in Huntington's Disease" | [T] - ARZNEIM.-FORSCH./DRUG RES., vol. 41(I), no. 3a, 1991, pages 303-309; J. KRIEGLSTEIN et al.: "Pharmakologische Grundlagen der Therapie der zerebralen Ischämie" | [T] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 109, no. 7, 15th August 1988, page 64, abstract no. 48319g, Columbus, Ohio, US; G.K. STEINBERG et al.: "Delayed treatment with dextromethorphan and dextrorphan reduces cerebral damage after transient focal ischemia" & NEUROSCI. LETT. 1988, 89(2), 193-7 | [T] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 107, no. 17, 26th October 1987, page 62, abstract no. 147309u, Columbus, Ohio, US; M.P. GOLDBERG et al.: "Dextrorphan and dextromethorphan attenuate hypoxic injury in neuronal culture" & NEUROSCI. LETT. 1987, 80(1), 11-15 | [T] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 111, no. 21, 20th November 1989, pages 68-69, abstract no. 187420n, Columbus, Ohio, US; G.K. STEINBERG et al.: "Protective effect of N-methyl-D-aspartate antagonists after focal cerebral ischemia in rabbits" |