EP0269428 - Fet tuner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.06.1997 [1997/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RCA Thomson Licensing Corporation 2 Independence Way Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/26] | For all designated states RCA Thomson Licensing Corporation 2 Independence Way Princeton New Jersey 08540 / US | ||
Former [1988/23] | For all designated states RCA LICENSING CORPORATION 2 Independence Way Princeton New Jersey 08540 / US | ||
Former [1988/22] | For all designated states RCA CORPORATION 201 Washington Road Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Muterspaugh, Max Ward 5518 Skyridge Drive Indianapolis Indiana / US | [1988/22] | Representative(s) | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/15] | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | ||
Former [1988/23] | Smith, Thomas Ian Macdonald RCA International Limited Burdett House 15-16 Buckingham Street London WC2N 6DU / GB | ||
Former [1988/22] | Smith, Thomas Ian Macdonald GE/RCA Patent Operation Burdett House, 4th Floor 15-16 Buckingham Street London WC2N 6DU / GB | Application number, filing date | 87310388.1 | 25.11.1987 | [1988/22] | Priority number, date | US19860935439 | 26.11.1986 Original published format: US 935439 | [1988/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0269428 | Date: | 01.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0269428 | Date: | 23.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0269428 | Date: | 12.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H03B5/12, H03J3/18 | [1989/31] | CPC: |
H03B5/1228 (EP,US);
H03J7/00 (KR);
H03B5/1203 (EP,US);
H03B5/1243 (EP,US);
H03B5/1296 (EP,US);
H03B2200/004 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1988/22] | H03B5/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1988/22] | Title | German: | Tuner mit FET | [1988/22] | English: | Fet tuner | [1988/22] | French: | Tête de réception à transistor à effet de champ | [1988/22] | Examination procedure | 22.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/13] | 27.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3723905 (STERNER J, et al); | [A]FR2451133 (BLAUPUNKT WERKE GMBH [DE]); | [A]US4442548 (LEHMANN WILLIAM L [US]); | [A]US4616193 (MEYER WALTER [US]); | [XPD]US4703286 (MUTERSPAUGH MAX W [US]); | [XED]EP0270298 (RCA LICENSING CORP [US]) | Examination | US3482167 | EP0124940 |