EP0272809 - Adhesion promoter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.12.1994 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.02.1995 [1995/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toray Silicone Co., Ltd. 8 Nihonbashi-muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/26] | For all designated states Toray Silicone Co., Ltd. 8 Nihonbashi-muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hamada, Yuji 6, 1-chome, Yushudai Nishi Ichihara-shi Chiba Prefecture / JP | 02 /
Masaoka, Hiroshi 6, 1-chome, Yushudai Nishi Ichihara-shi Chiba Prefecture / JP | 03 /
Sasaki, Shosaku 25-10, 6-chome, Aobadai Ichihara-shi Chiba Prefecture / JP | [1988/26] | Representative(s) | Laredo, Jack Joseph, et al Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/26] | Laredo, Jack Joseph, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 87310396.4 | 25.11.1987 | [1988/26] | Priority number, date | JP19860280337 | 25.11.1986 Original published format: JP 28033786 | [1988/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0272809 | Date: | 29.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0272809 | Date: | 14.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0272809 | Date: | 09.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/54, C08L83/04, C09D201/00, C08G77/26, C08G77/38 | [1994/06] | CPC: |
C08G77/26 (EP,US);
C09D183/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/26] | C08K5/54, C08L83/04, C09D3/82, C08G77/26, C08G77/38 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1988/26] | Title | German: | Mittel zur Verbesserung der Haftung | [1988/26] | English: | Adhesion promoter | [1988/26] | French: | Promoteur d'adhésion | [1988/26] | Examination procedure | 01.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/27] | 06.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2063281 (TORAY SILICONE CO); | [A]EP0074001 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [Y]EP0081444 (RHONE POULENC SPEC CHIM [FR]); | [A]US4460739 (ASHBY BRUCE A [US]); | [Y]EP0220733 (TORAY SILICONE CO [JP]); | [L]US4727168 (YOSHINO MASACHIKA [JP], et al) | Examination | - E.P.Plueddemann, "Silane Coupling Agents", Plenum Press, N.Y. (1982), pages 31,63,65,142 |