EP0296290 - Product-out-of-registration control for high speed wrapping machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.09.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.11.1992 [1992/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Doboy Packaging Machinery, Inc. 869 South Knowles Avenue New Richmond, Wisconsin 54017 / US | [1988/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heaney, Steven R. 5605 Albert Street Shoreview Minnesota 55126 / US | [1988/52] | Representative(s) | MacGregor, Gordon, et al Eric Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/52] | MacGregor, Gordon, et al ERIC POTTER CLARKSON St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham, NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 87310496.2 | 27.11.1987 | [1988/52] | Priority number, date | US19870066255 | 25.06.1987 Original published format: US 66255 | [1988/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0296290 | Date: | 28.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0296290 | Date: | 13.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B65B9/06, B65B41/18 | [1988/52] | CPC: |
B65B57/14 (EP,US);
B65B9/067 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, NL [1988/52] | Title | German: | Produkt-aus-Register-Kontrolle für Hochgeschwindigkeitsumwickelmaschine | [1988/52] | English: | Product-out-of-registration control for high speed wrapping machine | [1988/52] | French: | Contrôle de produits-hors-registre pour machine d'enveloppement à vitesse élevée | [1988/52] | Examination procedure | 09.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/32] | 18.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.05.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.08.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0190498 (DOBOY PACKAGING MACH [US]); | [A]EP0084299 (ALISYNCRO SRL [IT]) |