EP0271333 - Heating apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.07.1991 [1991/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C.R. Clarke & Company (UK) Limited Unit 3 Betws Industrial Park Foundry Road Ammanford Dyfed SA18 2LS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/24] | For all designated states C.R. Clarke & Company (UK) Limited Unit 3 Betws Industrial Park Foundry Road Ammanford Dyfed SA18 2LS / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Clarke, Christopher R. Fforestfach Farm Tycroes Road Tycroes Ammanford Dyfed SA18 3NS / GB | [1988/24] | Representative(s) | Austin, Hedley William, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/24] | Austin, Hedley William, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Alexandra House 1 Alexandra Road Swansea West Glamorgan SA1 5ED / GB | Application number, filing date | 87310835.1 | 09.12.1987 | [1988/24] | Priority number, date | GB19860029445 | 09.12.1986 Original published format: GB 8629445 | [1988/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0271333 | Date: | 15.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0271333 | Date: | 12.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0271333 | Date: | 25.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B29C53/04, H05B3/00 | [1988/24] | CPC: |
B29C35/08 (EP);
B29C53/04 (EP);
H05B3/00 (EP);
B29C2035/0822 (EP);
B29K2025/00 (EP);
B29K2069/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, IT, NL, SE [1988/24] | Title | German: | Heizgerät | [1988/24] | English: | Heating apparatus | [1988/24] | French: | Appareil de chauffage | [1988/24] | Examination procedure | 05.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/23] | 14.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2282982 ; | [Y]US3980251 ; | [Y]DE1038749 ; | [A]AT362930B ; | [A]FR2426555 ; | [A]DE1218139 ; | [A]DD51421 | [Y] - PLASTVERARBEITER, vol. 30, no. 1, January 1979, pages 11-14, Speyer, DE; G. Mager: "Variationsmöglichkeiten beim Abkanten und örtlichen Biegen von thermoplastischem Plattenmaterial" |