EP0273620 - Rotary magnetic head devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.03.1993 [1993/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/27] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suwa, Hisashi Patents Div. Sony Corp. 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | 02 /
Sato, Seiji Patents Div. Sony Corp. 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | 03 /
Matsubara, Susumu Patents Div. Sony Corp. 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | 04 /
Yano, Eiji Patents Div. Sony Corp. 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | 05 /
Koizumi, Katsuyuki Patents Div. Sony Corp. 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [1988/27] | Representative(s) | Thomas, Christopher Hugo, et al D. Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | [1988/27] | Application number, filing date | 87310883.1 | 10.12.1987 | [1988/27] | Priority number, date | JP19860312917 | 30.12.1986 Original published format: JP 31291786 | [1988/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0273620 | Date: | 06.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0273620 | Date: | 18.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/52, G11B5/53 | [1988/27] | CPC: |
G11B15/61 (EP,US);
G11B5/02 (KR);
G11B25/063 (EP,US);
G11B5/53 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1988/27] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung mit drehbarem Magnetkopf | [1988/27] | English: | Rotary magnetic head devices | [1988/27] | French: | Dispositif de tête magnétique rotative | [1988/27] | Examination procedure | 15.11.1988 | Examination requested [1989/02] | 28.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.09.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP58019728 ; | [X]JP58023322 ; | [X]JP58032224 ; | [X]JP58164014 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Unexamined Applications, Field P, Vol. 7, No. 93, April 19, 1983 The Patent Office Japanese Government page 97 P 192 & JP-A-58 019 728 (Canon K.K.), & JP58019728 A 00000000 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Unexamined Applications, Field P, Vol. 7, No. 101, April 28, 1983 The Patent Office Japanese Government page 11 P 194 & JP-A- 58 023 322 (Canon K.K.), & JP58023322 A 00000000 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Unexamined Applications, Field P, Vol. 7, No. 113, May 18, 1983 The Patent Office Japenese Government page 4 P 197 & JP-A-58 032 224 (Suwa Seikosha K.K.), & JP58032224 A 00000000 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Unexamined Applications, Field P, Vol. 7, No. 290, December 24, 1983 The Patent Office Japanese Government page 125 P 245 & JP-A-58 164 014 Tokyo Shibaura Denki K.K.), & JP58164014 A 00000000 | Examination | EP0177088 |