EP0274870 - Micelles containing a non-steroidal antiinflammatory compound [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.10.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.1991 | Refusal of application | published on 11.12.1991 [1991/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CORTECS LIMITED The Old Blue School Lower Square Isleworth Middlesex TW7 6RL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/29] | For all designated states CORTECS LIMITED The Old Blue School Lower Square Isleworth Middlesex TW7 6RL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Story, Michael John Elm Cottage Greaves Lane Threapwood Near Malpas Cheshire SY14 6AS / GB | 02 /
Flynn, Michael John Hunterscombe Dorking Road Leatherhead Surrey KT22 8JT / GB | [1988/29] | Representative(s) | Sheard, Andrew Gregory, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/29] | Sheard, Andrew Gregory, et al Kilburn & Strode 30, John Street London WC1N 2DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 87310931.8 | 11.12.1987 | [1988/29] | Priority number, date | GB19860030273 | 18.12.1986 Original published format: GB 8630273 | [1988/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0274870 | Date: | 20.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0274870 | Date: | 07.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/10, A61K47/00 | [1988/29] | CPC: |
A61K9/4858 (EP,US);
A61K9/1075 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/29] | Title | German: | Nichtsteroidale Entzündungshemmer enthaltende Micellen | [1988/29] | English: | Micelles containing a non-steroidal antiinflammatory compound | [1988/29] | French: | Micelles contenant des agents anti-inflammatoires non-stéroidiques | [1988/29] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 21.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/16] | 09.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.07.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1991/50] | 26.07.1991 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1991/50] | 01.08.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.1991 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0178436 (DOLORGIET GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [X]EP0179583 (MERCK & CO INC [US]); | [XP]EP0223369 (BOOTS CO PLC [GB]) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 90, no. 16, 16th April 1979, page 370, abstract no. 127464t, Columbus, Ohio, US; H. KRASOWSKA: "Solubilities of certain antiinflammatory compounds in nonionic surfacant solutions", & PHARM. IND. 1978, 40(12), 1381-4 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 94, no. 16, 10th April 1981, page 378, abstract no. 127260f, Columbus, Ohio, US; H. KRASOWSKA: "Effect of micellar solubilization on the gastrointestinal absorption of indomethacin in the rat", & INT. J. PHARM. 1980, 7(2), 137-43 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 94, no. 8, 23rd February 1981, page 358, abstract no. 52772p, Columbus, Ohio, US; A.H. GHANEM et al.: "Solubilization of flufenamic acid", & PHARM. IND. 1980, 42(8), 854-6 |