EP0273638 - Image scanner systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.10.1994 [1994/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/27] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matteson, Ronald Grant 4625 Lewis Road Walworth New York 14568 / US | 02 /
Tandon, Jagdish Chand 43 Kirkby Trail Fairport New York 14450 / US | [1988/27] | Representative(s) | Weatherald, Keith Baynes, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/05] | Weatherald, Keith Baynes, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | ||
Former [1988/27] | Weatherald, Keith Baynes Rank Xerox Limited Patent Department 364 Euston Road London NW1 3BL / GB | Application number, filing date | 87311044.9 | 15.12.1987 | [1988/27] | Priority number, date | US19860943337 | 18.12.1986 Original published format: US 943337 | [1988/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0273638 | Date: | 06.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0273638 | Date: | 23.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0273638 | Date: | 27.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/46 | [1988/27] | CPC: |
H04N1/486 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1988/27] | Title | German: | Bildabtastersysteme | [1988/27] | English: | Image scanner systems | [1988/27] | French: | Systèmes d'analyse d'images | [1988/27] | Examination procedure | 15.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/02] | 01.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4396950 (ROTH ROGER R); | [A]EP0043721 (XEROX CORP [US]); | [A]EP0070620 (XEROX CORP [US]); | [A]US4264921 (PENNINGTON KEITH S, et al) |