EP0272882 - Bench vice [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.12.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.1992 | Change - withdrawal | published on 20.01.1993 [1993/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yang, Tai-Her 5-1 Taipin Street Si-Hu Town Dzan-Hwa / TW | [N/P] |
Former [1988/26] | For all designated states Yang, Tai-Her 5-1 Taipin Street Si-Hu Town Dzan-Hwa / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/26] | Representative(s) | Arthur, Bryan Edward, et al Withers & Rogers Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/26] | Arthur, Bryan Edward, et al Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 87311127.2 | 17.12.1987 | [1988/26] | Priority number, date | US19860943774 | 19.12.1986 Original published format: US 943774 | [1988/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0272882 | Date: | 29.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0272882 | Date: | 18.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B25B1/10, B25B1/24 | [1988/26] | CPC: |
B25B1/103 (EP,US);
B25B1/125 (EP,US);
B25B1/2489 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/26] | Title | German: | Schraubstock | [1988/26] | English: | Bench vice | [1988/26] | French: | Etau | [1988/26] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 09.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/23] | 19.12.1990 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.1991 | 04   M06   Not yet paid | 02.01.1992 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2159717 (KIPP MASCHF HEINRICH); | [X]FR2428504 (PRZYRZADOW UCHWYTOW PONAR [PL]); | [X]US1491632 (REYNOLDS BION O); | [X]GB685257 (GLACIER CO LTD); | [X]DE89845 ; | [X]FR2358958 (SOMBORN LANG FERRY ET CIE ANC [FR]); | [X]US1415103 (MCQUEEN FRANCIS W); | [A]DE2912832 (BERNSTEIN WERKZEUGFABRIK STEIN); | [A]FR1317972 |