EP0275701 - Improved packaging and method of filling and dispensing a plurality of bottles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.05.1991 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.07.1991 [1991/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nalge Company 75 Panorama Creek Drive P O Box 20365 Rochester New York 14602 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/30] | For all designated states Nalge Company 75 Panorama Creek Drive P O Box 20365 Rochester New York 14602 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Clarkson, Walter James 60 A6 Whitney Ridge Road Fairport New York 14450 / US | [1988/30] | Representative(s) | Oliver, Roy Edward, et al W.P. THOMPSON & CO. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/30] | Oliver, Roy Edward, et al W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 87311376.5 | 23.12.1987 | [1988/30] | Priority number, date | US19870005825 | 21.01.1987 Original published format: US 5825 | [1988/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0275701 | Date: | 27.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0275701 | Date: | 21.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B65D71/00, B65B21/02 | [1988/49] | CPC: |
B65D71/10 (EP,US);
B65D2571/00018 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/30] | B65D71/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/30] | Title | German: | Verpackung und Verfahren zum Füllen und Ausgeben einer Vielzahl von Flaschen | [1988/30] | English: | Improved packaging and method of filling and dispensing a plurality of bottles | [1988/30] | French: | Emballage et procédé de remplissage et de décharge d'une pluralité de bouteilles | [1988/30] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 06.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/32] | 06.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/28] | 13.02.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.1991 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]BE669364 ; | [A]US3331503 (BROWN MARION L); | [A]US3353326 (BECKER WILLIAM C); | [A]US3494097 (BOTT GEORGE SPENCER, et al); | [A]US3515272 (GAL JOHN C VON); | [A]DE2208985 (BECK HANS) |