EP0233090 - Glass container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALLIBERT SA. Centr'Alp, 1343, Rue Aristide Bergès 38340 Voreppe / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/34] | For all designated states ALLIBERT S.A. Société anonyme dite: 129, avenue Léon Blum F-38042 Grenoble Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Faucillon, Michel 6, rue Jean Giono F-95560 Baillet en France / FR | 02 /
Moret, Michel 68, rue de Saint Leu F-95600 Eaubonne / FR | [1987/34] | Representative(s) | Lerner, François 5, rue Jules Lefèbvre 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/34] | Lerner, François 5, rue Jules Lefèbvre F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 87400005.2 | 05.01.1987 | [1987/34] | Priority number, date | FR19860000171 | 08.01.1986 Original published format: FR 8600171 | [1987/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0233090 | Date: | 19.08.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0233090 | Date: | 24.10.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B65F1/12 | [1987/34] | CPC: |
B65D90/623 (EP);
B65F1/125 (EP);
Y02W30/60 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI, NL [1987/34] | Title | German: | Altglasbehälter | [1987/34] | English: | Glass container | [1987/34] | French: | Conteneur à verre | [1987/34] | Examination procedure | 20.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/03] | 23.01.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.07.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 15.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.04.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 24.10.1990 | NL | 24.10.1990 | [2007/52] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 24.10.1990 | |
NL | 24.10.1990 | ||
Former [1991/44] | NL | 24.10.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1406214 ; | [A]FR2539112 ; | [A]US3761135 ; | [A]US3719296 ; | [A]DE2715992 ; | [A]DE2935969 ; | [A]FR2555145 |