EP0231138 - 1-Acylaminomethyl-imidazo[1,2-a] quinoline derivatives, their preparation and therapeutical use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.1991 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.04.1991 [1991/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SYNTHELABO 22, avenue Galilée 92350 Le Plessis-Robinson / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/32] | For all designated states SYNTHELABO 22, avenue Galilée F-92350 Le Plessis-Robinson / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
George, Pascal 39, rue Henri de Vilmorin F-94400 Vitry S/Seine / FR | 02 /
de Peretti, Danièle 14, rue Ampère F-92160 Antony / FR | [1987/32] | Representative(s) | Ludwig, Jacques, et al Sanofi-Aventis 174 avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/32] | Ludwig, Jacques, et al SYNTHELABO, Service Brevets, B.P. 72 F-92352 Le Plessis Robinson Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 87400074.8 | 14.01.1987 | [1987/32] | Priority number, date | FR19860000835 | 22.01.1986 Original published format: FR 8600835 | [1987/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0231138 | Date: | 05.08.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0231138 | Date: | 18.04.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, A61K31/435, // (C07D471/04, 235:00, 221:00) | [1987/32] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/32] | Title | German: | 1-Acylaminomethylimidazo[1,2-a] chinolinderivate, ihre Herstellung und therapeutische Verwendung | [1987/32] | English: | 1-Acylaminomethyl-imidazo[1,2-a] quinoline derivatives, their preparation and therapeutical use | [1987/32] | French: | Dérivés d'acylaminométhyl-1imidazo [1,2-a] quinoléines, leur préparation et leur application en thérapeutique | [1990/16] |
Former [1987/32] | Dérivés d'acylaminométhyl-1[1,2-a] quinoléines, leur préparation et leur application en thérapeutique | Examination procedure | 13.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/11] | 03.07.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 08.08.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 22.09.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.01.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB991589 (SELVI & C LAB BIOTERAPICO); | [AP]EP0172096 (SYNTHELABO [FR]) |