EP0237390 - Method for controlling fluid flow through a valve and apparatus for carrying out this method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.02.1990 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/38] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay F-75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cuny, Francis 6, rue du Général de Gaulle F-78250 Mezy-sur-Seine / FR | 02 /
Vermeille, Hugues 14, rue Champ Rochas F-38240 Meylan / FR | 03 /
Arnault, Jean Cidex 339 F-38330 Saint-Nazaire-les-Eymes / FR | [1987/38] | Representative(s) | Vesin, Jacques, et al L'Air Liquide S.A. Service Propriété Industrielle, 75 Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2008/32] |
Former [1987/38] | Vesin, Jacques, et al L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, quai d'Orsay F-75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 87400310.6 | 12.02.1987 | [1987/38] | Priority number, date | FR19860002012 | 14.02.1986 Original published format: FR 8602012 | [1987/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0237390 | Date: | 16.09.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/36, G01F15/075, G01F1/50 | [1987/38] | CPC: |
G01F1/363 (EP,US);
G01F1/50 (EP,US);
G01F15/0755 (EP,US);
Y10T137/0357 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7759 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7761 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/38] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Regeln des Durchflusses einer Flüssigkeit durch ein Ventil und Gerät zum Durchführen dieses Verfahrens | [1987/38] | English: | Method for controlling fluid flow through a valve and apparatus for carrying out this method | [1987/38] | French: | Procédé de contrôle du débit d'un fluide dans une vanne et appareil pour la mise en oeuvre de ce procédé | [1987/38] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 16.02.1987 | Examination requested [1987/49] | 28.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/15] | 10.11.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1990/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3241783 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]); | [Y]US3524344 (CONVERSE VERNON G, et al); | [X]EP0061856 (LUCAS IND PLC [GB]); | [A]FR2447012 (FAURE HERMAN ETS); | [A]GB2026704 (ALSTHOM ATLANTIQUE) |