Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
28.02.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.04.1991 [1991/16] |
17.03.1990 | (Expected) grant | published on 02.05.1990 [1990/18] |
19.12.1989 | Change - applicant | published on 07.02.1990 [1990/06] |
23.02.1989 | First examination report | |
25.03.1988 | Request for examination filed | published on 11.05.1988 [1988/19] |
15.08.1987 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 30.09.1987 [1987/40] |