EP0242245 - Chemiluminescence method for assaying compounds containing primary amino groups using 1-cyano-2-substituted benz(f)- or naphth(f)isoindole fluorescers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.08.1992 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.10.1992 [1992/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OREAD LABORATORIES, INC. 2065 Constant Avenue Pharmaceutical Chemistry Building Lawrence Kansas 66046 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/43] | For all designated states OREAD LABORATORIES, INC. 2065 Constant Avenue Pharmaceutical Chemistry Building Lawrence Kansas 66046 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matuszewski, Bodgan 188 Ardwick Terrace Landsdale PA 19446 / US | 02 /
Givens, Richard 2900 Santa Fe Lane Lawrence KS 66046 / US | 03 /
Carlson, Robert G. RFD 4, Box 142 Lawrence KS 66044 / US | 04 /
Higuchi, Takeru 2811 Schwarz Road Lawrence KS 66046 / US | 05 /
kawasaki, Takao 2401 W. 25th 9 A8 Lawrence KS 66046 / US | 06 /
Wong, Osborne S. 7926 Oakview Lenexa KS 66215 / US | [1987/43] | Representative(s) | Peaucelle, Chantal, et al S.C. Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud 67, boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/43] | Peaucelle, Chantal, et al S.C. Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud 67, boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 87400527.5 | 10.03.1987 | [1987/43] | Priority number, date | US19860837671 | 10.03.1986 Original published format: US 837671 | [1987/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0242245 | Date: | 21.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0242245 | Date: | 06.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68, G01N33/52 | [1987/43] | CPC: |
G01N33/84 (EP,US);
G01N33/52 (EP,US);
G01N33/6809 (EP,US);
Y10T436/142222 (EP,US);
Y10T436/172307 (EP,US);
Y10T436/173845 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/43] | Title | German: | Chemilumineszierendes Verfahren zur Bestimmung von primäre Aminogruppen enthaltenden Verbindungen mittels 1-Cyano-2-substituierter Benz(f)- oder Naphth(f)isoindolen als fluoreszierende Verbindungen | [1987/43] | English: | Chemiluminescence method for assaying compounds containing primary amino groups using 1-cyano-2-substituted benz(f)- or naphth(f)isoindole fluorescers | [1987/43] | French: | Méthode chimioluminescente pour l'essai des composés contenant des groupes d'amines primaires en utilisant des benz(f)- ou naphth(f)isoindoles 1-cyano-2-substitués comme composés fluorescents | [1987/43] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 16.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/02] | 27.06.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 25.11.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 18.12.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/42] | 15.05.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1992/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1992 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0138092 (SHIMADZU CORP [JP]); | [YPD]EP0199432 (OREAD LAB INC [US]) | [YP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 105, no. 21, 24th November 1986, page 707, abstract no, 190845m, Columbus, Ohio, US; R.G. CARLSON et al.: "New derivatizing agents for amino acids and peptides. I. Facile synthesis of N-substituted 1-cyanobenzÄfÜ isoindoles and their spectroscopic properties", & J.ORG. CHEM. 1986, 51(21), 3978-83 | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 101, no. 3, 16th July 1984, page 313, abstract no. 20064f, Columbus, Ohio, US; T. MIURA et al.: "A fluorometric method for the specific determination of serum arginine with 2,3-naphthalenedicarbaldehyde", & ANAL. BIOCHEM. 1984, 139(2), 432-7 | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol.68, no.19, 06 May 1968, Columbus, OH (US); M.M.RAUHUT et al., pp.8834-8835, no.91556d | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol.98, no.15, 11 April 1983, Columbus, OH (US); H.NAKAMURA et al., p.571, no.125304g | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 98, no. 15, 11th April 1983, page 571, abstract no. 125304g, Columbus, Ohio, US; H. NAKAMURA et al.: "On the stability of isoindole-type fluorophores derived from o-phthalaldehyde, primary amino compounds and thiols", & ANAL. LETT. 1982, 15(A17), 1393-410 |