EP0240419 - Process for coating powdery and/or grained radioactive or toxic waste with granulated bitumen [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.10.1988 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TECHNICATOME Société Technique pour l'Energie Atomique 29, rue de la Fédération 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/41] | For all designated states TECHNICATOME Société Technique pour l'Energie Atomique 29, rue de la Fédération F-75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Raibaud, Jean 81, rue Jean Roger Thorelle F-92340 Bourg-La-Reine / FR | 02 /
Cirasse, Pascal 405, rue de Vaugirard F-75015 Paris / FR | [1987/41] | Representative(s) | Mongrédien, André, et al c/o BREVATOME 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | [1987/41] | Application number, filing date | 87400681.0 | 26.03.1987 | [1987/41] | Priority number, date | FR19860004844 | 04.04.1986 Original published format: FR 8604844 | [1987/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0240419 | Date: | 07.10.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G21F9/16, G21F9/34 | [1987/41] | CPC: |
G21F9/307 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1987/41] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Einbettung von pulverigen und/oder körnigen, radioaktiven oder toxischen Abfällen in granuliertem Bitumen | [1987/41] | English: | Process for coating powdery and/or grained radioactive or toxic waste with granulated bitumen | [1987/41] | French: | Procédé d'enrobage de déchets radioactifs ou toxiques en poudres et/ou en grains dans du bitume en granulés | [1987/41] | File destroyed: | 29.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 08.04.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/48] | 04.07.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1988/48] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]FR2318487 ; | [AD]DE2240119 |