EP0246939 - Fe-Cr-Al stainless steel having high oxidation resistance and spalling resistance and Fe-Cr-Al steel foil for catalyst substrate of catalytic converter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.1993 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.06.1993 [1993/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAWASAKI STEEL CORPORATION 1-28, Kitahonmachi-dori 1-Chome Chuo-Ku, Kobe-Shi Hyogo-Ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/48] | For all designated states KAWASAKI STEEL CORPORATION 1-28, Kitahonmachi-dori 1-Chome Chuo-Ku, Kobe-Shi Hyogo-Ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishii, Kazuhide c/o Technical Research Division KAWASAKI STEEL CORPORATION 1, Kawasaki-cho Chiba-shi Chiba-ken / JP | 02 /
Kawasaki, Tatsuo c/o Technical Research Division KAWASAKI STEEL CORPORATION 1, Kawasaki-cho Chiba-shi Chiba-ken / JP | [1987/48] | Representative(s) | Nony, Michel NONY & ASSOCIES 3, rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/48] | Nony, Michel NONY & ASSOCIES 29, rue Cambacérès F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 87400917.8 | 21.04.1987 | [1987/48] | Priority number, date | JP19860091815 | 21.04.1986 Original published format: JP 9181586 | JP19860218776 | 17.09.1986 Original published format: JP 21877686 | [1987/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0246939 | Date: | 25.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0246939 | Date: | 12.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0246939 | Date: | 01.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/18, F01N3/00 | [1987/48] | CPC: |
F01N3/281 (EP,US);
C22C38/18 (EP,US);
F01N3/2807 (EP,US);
F01N2530/04 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12431 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24149 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1987/48] | Title | German: | Rostfreier Chrom-Aluminium-Stahl mit hoher Beständigkeit gegen Oxydation und Abblätterung und Folien aus Chrom-Aluminium-Stahl für Katalysatorträger in katalytischen Konvertern | [1987/48] | English: | Fe-Cr-Al stainless steel having high oxidation resistance and spalling resistance and Fe-Cr-Al steel foil for catalyst substrate of catalytic converter | [1987/48] | French: | Acier inoxydable au chrome-aluminium à haute résistance contre l'oxydation et l'écaillement et feuillard en acier au chrome-aluminium pour substrat de catalyseur d'un convertisseur catalytique | [1987/48] | Examination procedure | 10.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/10] | 11.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 18.11.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 29.11.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0091526 (ALLEGHENY LUDLUM STEEL [US]); | [A]EP0035369 (SHEFFIELD FORGEMASTERS [GB]); | [A]DE1068023 ; | [A]GB833446 (KANTHAL AB) |