blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0245179

EP0245179 - System for detachably mounting semiconductors on conductor substrate. [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.11.1993
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip28.11.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 14.01.2004  [2004/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORPORATION
146 Main Street
Maynard, MA 01754 / US
[1987/46]
Inventor(s)01 / Lee, James C.K.
28446 Christopher Lane
Los Altos Hills California 94022 / US
02 / Amdahl, Gene M.
165 Patricia Avenue
Atherton California 94025 / US
03 / Beck, Richard
10182 Parish Place
Cupertino California 95014 / US
04 / Lee, Chune
1836 Cabrillo Street
San Francisco California 94121 / US
05 / Hu, Edward
648 Kodiak Court =4
Sunnyvale California 94087 / US
[1987/46]
Representative(s)Mongrédien, André, et al
c/o SOCIETE DE PROTECTION DES INVENTIONS 25, rue de Ponthieu
F-75008 Paris / FR
[1987/46]
Application number, filing date87401034.106.05.1987
[1987/46]
Priority number, dateUS1986086072507.05.1986         Original published format: US 860725
[1987/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0245179
Date:11.11.1987
Language:EN
[1987/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0245179
Date:05.10.1988
Language:EN
[1988/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0245179
Date:30.12.1992
Language:EN
[1992/53]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.08.1988
ClassificationIPC:H01L23/48, H01L23/50, H01L23/32
[1988/38]
CPC:
H01L23/4006 (EP); H01L23/32 (EP); H01L23/49827 (EP);
H01L2023/4043 (EP); H01L2023/4056 (EP); H01L2023/4062 (EP);
H01L2023/4068 (EP); H01L2924/0002 (EP); H01L2924/15312 (EP);
H01L2924/16152 (EP) (-)
C-Set:
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP)
Former IPC [1987/46]H01L23/32, H01L23/48
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1987/46]
TitleGerman:Lösbares Montierungssystem für Halbleiter auf einem leitenden Substrat[1987/46]
English:System for detachably mounting semiconductors on conductor substrate.[1987/46]
French:Système de montage amovible pour semi-conducteurs sur un substrat conducteur[1987/46]
Examination procedure14.02.1989Examination requested  [1989/15]
08.10.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.04.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.04.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.10.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.02.1992Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
24.06.1992Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.08.1992Fee for grant paid
28.08.1992Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.10.1993No opposition filed within time limit [1993/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.05.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
30.04.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
31.12.1990Renewal fee patent year 05
15.04.1992Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
06.06.1987AT   M02   Fee paid on   24.07.1987
06.06.1987ES   M02   Fee paid on   24.07.1987
06.06.1987GR   M02   Fee paid on   24.07.1987
06.06.1987LU   M02   Fee paid on   24.07.1987
06.06.1987SE   M02   Fee paid on   24.07.1987
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT30.12.1992
BE30.12.1992
CH30.12.1992
GR30.12.1992
LI30.12.1992
NL30.12.1992
SE30.12.1992
ES10.04.1993
[2004/03]
Former [2000/04]AT30.12.1992
BE30.12.1992
CH30.12.1992
GR30.12.1992
LI30.12.1992
NL30.12.1992
SE30.12.1992
Former [1994/25]AT30.12.1992
BE30.12.1992
CH30.12.1992
LI30.12.1992
NL30.12.1992
SE30.12.1992
Former [1993/38]BE30.12.1992
CH30.12.1992
LI30.12.1992
NL30.12.1992
SE30.12.1992
Former [1993/28]CH30.12.1992
LI30.12.1992
SE30.12.1992
Former [1993/27]CH30.12.1992
LI30.12.1992
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO8500467  (SILICON CONNECTION INC [US]);
 [E]US4667219  (LEE JAMES C K [US], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.