EP0246948 - Heating and ventilating apparatus for a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 15.10.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO THERMIQUE HABITACLE 8, rue Louis-Lormand, La Verrière 78320 Le Mesnil-Saint-Denis / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/05] | For all designated states VALEO THERMIQUE HABITACLE 8, rue Louis-Lormand, La Verrière F-78320 Le Mesnil-Saint-Denis / FR | ||
Former [1987/48] | For all designated states VALEO 64 Avenue de la Grande Armée F-75017 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vincent, Philippe 9, rue des Piqueurs de Grès F-28230 Epernon / FR | [1987/48] | Representative(s) | Lemaire, Marc, et al Valeo Management Services, Sce Propriété Industrielle 2, rue André Boulle B.P. 150 94004 Créteil / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/45] | Lemaire, Marc, et al Valeo Management Services, Sce Propriété Industrielle 2, rue André Boulle B.P. 150 F-94004 Créteil / FR | ||
Former [1987/48] | Lemaire, Marc Valeo Management Services, Service Propriété Industrielle, "Le Triangle", 15, rue des Rosiers F-93585 Saint-Ouen Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 87401037.4 | 07.05.1987 | [1987/48] | Priority number, date | FR19860007320 | 22.05.1986 Original published format: FR 8607320 | [1987/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0246948 | Date: | 25.11.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0246948 | Date: | 08.08.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/32] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0246948 | Date: | 01.12.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/00 | [1987/48] | CPC: |
B60H1/00071 (EP);
B60H1/00678 (EP);
B60H2001/00164 (EP);
B60H2001/00171 (EP);
B60H2001/002 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, IT [1987/48] | Title | German: | Heiz- und Belüftungseinrichtung für ein Kraftfahrzeug | [1987/48] | English: | Heating and ventilating apparatus for a motor vehicle | [1987/48] | French: | Installation de chauffage et de ventilation pour véhicule automobile | [1987/48] | Examination procedure | 28.10.1987 | Examination requested [1988/01] | 04.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.11.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
06.05.1991
22.05.1991
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.05.1991
22.05.1991
ADMISSIBLE SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [1991/27] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.05.1991
22.05.1991
ADMISSIBLE Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 D-80506 München / DE | 24.06.1991 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.10.1991 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.1993 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.04.1993 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 07.04.1993 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 17.04.1993 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 16.07.1993 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 04.09.1993 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP60131312 ; | [A]JP57182514 ; | [A]JP59120513 ; | [X]GB1033175 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 294 (M-431)[2017], 20 novembre 1985; & JP-A-60 131 312 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO K.K.) 13-07-1985, & JP60131312 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 29 (M-191)[1174], 5 février 1983; & JP-A-57 182 514 (MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO K.K.) 10-11-1982, & JP57182514 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 240 (M-336)[1677], 6 novembre 1984; & JP-A-59 120 513 (NISSAN JIDOSHA K.K.) 12-07-1984, & JP59120513 A 00000000 |