EP0246956 - Process for the elimination of asphaltenes from a hydrocarbon feedstock [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.11.1991 [1991/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPAGNIE DE RAFFINAGE ET DE DISTRIBUTION TOTAL FRANCE 84, rue de Villiers 92300 Levallois Perret / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/48] | For all designated states COMPAGNIE DE RAFFINAGE ET DE DISTRIBUTION TOTAL FRANCE 84, rue de Villiers F-92300 Levallois Perret / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chombart, Didier 45, Rue Le Marois F-75016 Paris / FR | 02 /
Cormerais, François-Xavier 4,Rue Guy de Maupassant Fontaine La Mallet F-76290 Montivilliers / FR | 03 /
Laborde, Michel 100 Chemin des Fonds F-69110 Sainte Foy les Lyon / FR | [1987/48] | Representative(s) | Jolly, Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Jolly 54, rue de Clichy 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/17] | Jolly, Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Jolly 54, rue de Clichy F-75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1987/48] | Jolly, Jean-Pierre Cabinet Jolly 54, rue de Clichy F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 87401091.1 | 14.05.1987 | [1987/48] | Priority number, date | FR19860006994 | 15.05.1986 Original published format: FR 8606994 | [1987/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0246956 | Date: | 25.11.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0246956 | Date: | 28.11.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C10G21/00, C10G53/06 | [1987/48] | CPC: |
C10G21/003 (EP,US);
C10G53/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, IT, NL [1987/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Entfernung von Asphalt aus einer Kohlenwasserstoffbeschickung | [1987/48] | English: | Process for the elimination of asphaltenes from a hydrocarbon feedstock | [1987/48] | French: | Procédé de désasphaltage d'une charge hydrocarbonée lourde. | [1987/48] | Examination procedure | 16.04.1988 | Examination requested [1988/24] | 04.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.05.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.08.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2007587 (SHELL INT RESEARCH) |