EP0247936 - Dipped headlamp without a cap and having an offset concentration [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.06.1991 [1991/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO VISION 17, rue Henri Gautier 93012 Bobigny Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/52] | For all designated states VALEO VISION 17, rue Henri Gautier F-93012 Bobigny Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1987/49] | For all designated states CIBIE PROJECTEURS 17, rue Henri Gautier F-93012 Bobigny Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Collot, Patrice 39 Quai de l'Ourcq F-93500 Pantin / FR | [1987/49] | Representative(s) | Schrimpf, Robert, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/49] | Schrimpf, Robert, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 26, Avenue Kléber F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 87401170.3 | 25.05.1987 | [1987/49] | Priority number, date | FR19860007461 | 26.05.1986 Original published format: FR 8607461 | [1987/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0247936 | Date: | 02.12.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0247936 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | F21M3/08 | [1987/49] | CPC: |
F21S41/335 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [1987/49] | Title | German: | Abblendlichtscheinwerfer ohne Abblendkappe und mit versetzter Konzentration | [1987/49] | English: | Dipped headlamp without a cap and having an offset concentration | [1987/49] | French: | Projecteurs de croisement sans coupelle à concentration décalée | [1987/49] | Examination procedure | 25.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/13] | 16.05.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.12.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]BE656721 ; | [A]FR1400370 ; | [A]DE2921474 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) |