EP0251834 - Safety device for a building having a glass façade, façade glass panel with such a device and production of such a panel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 21.11.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VITRAGES ISOLANTS DE L'OUEST 8, Boulevard de l'Industrie F-53000 Laval / FR | For all designated states Paquet, Claude 47, rue de la Bretèche F-53940 St. Berthevin / FR | For all designated states Fousse, Claude 20 promenade de Barchelin F-45190 Beaugency / FR | For all designated states Flambart, Jean-Paul 38, rue de Foussard Tavers F-45190 Beaugency / FR | For all designated states Genuist, Gérard 62 rue du Val de Bootz F-53000 Laval / FR | [1988/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Paquet, Claude 47, rue de la Bretèche F-53940 St. Berthevin / FR | [1988/01] | Representative(s) | Derambure, Christian, et al BREESE DERAMBURE MAJEROWICZ 38, avenue de l'Opéra 75002 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/06] | Derambure, Christian, et al Cabinet Bouju Derambure (Bugnion) S.A., 52, rue de Monceau F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1988/01] | Derambure, Christian BUGNION ASSOCIES 55, rue Boissonade F-75014 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 87401174.5 | 25.05.1987 | [1988/01] | Priority number, date | FR19860007576 | 27.05.1986 Original published format: FR 8607576 | [1988/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0251834 | Date: | 07.01.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0251834 | Date: | 01.08.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | E04B2/96, E06B3/54 | [1988/01] | CPC: |
E06B3/5427 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL [1988/01] | Title | German: | Sicherheitsvorrichtung für Gebäude mit einer Glasfassade, Glasfassadenpaneel mit solch einer Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Herstellung | [1988/01] | English: | Safety device for a building having a glass façade, façade glass panel with such a device and production of such a panel | [1988/01] | French: | Dispositif de sécurité pour bâtiment à paroi vitrée, panneau façade vitre comportant un tel dispositif, et procédé de fabrication d'un tel panneau | [1990/31] |
Former [1988/01] | Dispositif de sécurité pour bâtiment à paroi vitrée,panneau façade vitre comportant un tel dispositif, et procédé de fabrication d'un tel panneau | Examination procedure | 07.04.1988 | Examination requested [1988/23] | 27.12.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.04.1991
13.05.1991
ADMISSIBLE Firma Eduard Hueck Postfach 18 68 D-58505 Lüdenscheid / DE Opponent's representative Gossel, Hans K., et al, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | 02
02.05.1991
03.06.1991
ADMISSIBLE Josef Gartner & Co. Postfach 20 40 D-89421 Gundelfingen / DE Opponent's representative Hertel, Werner Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/13] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.04.1991
13.05.1991
ADMISSIBLE Firma Eduard Hueck Postfach 18 68 D-58505 Lüdenscheid / DE Opponent's representative Gossel, Hans K., Dipl.-Ing., et al, et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 D-80538 München / DE | ||
02
02.05.1991
03.06.1991
ADMISSIBLE Josef Gartner & Co. Postfach 20 40 D-89421 Gundelfingen / DE Opponent's representative Hertel, Werner, Dipl.-Phys. Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 D-81671 München / DE | |||
Former [1991/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.04.1991
Firma Eduard Hueck Postfach 18 68 D-58505 Lüdenscheid / DE | ||
02
02.05.1991
ADMISSIBLE Josef Gartner & Co. Postfach 20 40 D-89421 Gundelfingen / DE Opponent's representative Hertel, Werner, Dipl.-Phys. Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 D-81671 München / DE | |||
Former [1991/25] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.04.1991
Firma Eduard Hueck Postfach 18 68 D-58505 Lüdenscheid / DE | 06.06.1991 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.12.1991 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 29.01.1992 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 29.04.1992 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 14.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 08.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 22.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 02.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 29.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 06.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 16.12.1994 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.01.1995 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 25.01.1995 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 03.02.1995 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1996/02] | Appeal following opposition | 23.03.1995 | Appeal received No. T0257/95 | 04.10.1995 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor inadmissible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 01.08.1990 | IT | 01.08.1990 | NL | 01.08.1990 | AT | 25.05.1991 | ES | 26.05.1994 | [2004/38] |
Former [1999/42] | GB | 01.08.1990 | |
IT | 01.08.1990 | ||
NL | 01.08.1990 | ||
AT | 25.05.1991 | ||
Former [1992/46] | GB | 01.08.1990 | |
NL | 01.08.1990 | ||
AT | 25.05.1991 | ||
Former [1991/41] | GB | 01.08.1990 | |
NL | 01.08.1990 | ||
Former [1991/33] | NL | 01.08.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2114440 (CIBA GEIGY AG); | [A]FR2160877 (CIBA GEIGY AG, et al); | [A]EP0130438 (FRANCIS GEOFFREY VERNON) |